pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Ross Beever Memorial Mycological Trust
CC52317
N/A
Registered

Registration details

16/07/2015
February 28
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Ross Beever Memorial Trust 16/07/2015
Ross Beever Memorial Mycological Trust 28/07/2016

Address for service

Landcare Research
Private Bag 92170
Auckland Mail Centre
Auckland
1142
Landcare Research
231 Morrin Road
St Johns
Auckland
1072

Charity's other details

0272114467
07 870 1478


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide financial support awards (grants) to full and part-time students studying the fungi of New Zealand at a post graduate level. 3.1 Primary Charitable Purposes or Objects The Trust exists to fulfil the following charitable purposes and objects in New Zealand: 3.1.1 Offer an award for post graduate study of fungal taxonomy, conservation, ecology, or pathology; 3.1.2 The award may be applied at the discretion of each successful student to provide financial support for field work, study-related travel, data analysis, reporting and living expenses or any combination of these purposes 3.1.3 Frequency and value of the award to be determined by the Board of Trustees; 3.1.4 Promote a better understanding within the community, of NZ’s fungal biodiversity and the important ecological roles of fungi;

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Education / training / research

Other (please state)

(Graduate Students Studying Mycology)

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust with 4 trustees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/08/2023 27/06/2023 $956 $5,270
31/08/2022 4/08/2022 $5,193 $5,000
31/08/2021 17/08/2021 $150 $0
31/08/2020 28/08/2020 $7,261 $1,005
31/08/2019 22/07/2019 $159 $1,000
31/08/2018 31/07/2018 $848 $0
31/08/2017 26/09/2017 $212 $500
31/08/2016 1/11/2017 $0 $500

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Renee Bronwyn Johansen Trustee 26/06/2020
David Orlovich Trustee 20/05/2015
Jessica Beever Trustee 20/05/2015
Tom Leslie Davies Trustee 20/05/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Toni June Atkinson Trustee 1/07/2019
Patrick L Leonard Trustee 16/05/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/03/2021 NOC009
28/08/2020 NOC008
2/11/2017 NOC004
22/04/2016 NOC002

Charity Documents