Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Veterans Cricket New Zealand
CC56931
N/A
Registered

Registration details

18/03/2019
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 10107
The Terrace
Wellington Central
Wellington
6143

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promote, advance, cultivate, foster and control the game of cricket at all levels throughout New Zealand for persons above the age specified by the Board. Advance education about cricket and cricket related skills amongst the New Zealand public, especially as to health, fitness and physical wellbeing; Promote the relief of sick, or injured, impotent or poor persons who have worked, or are working, in any cricket related area and ensure that those persons and entities are supported by VCNZ

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Sport / recreation

General public

Older people

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust - Trust Deed has two initial trustees and then provides for a minimum of six and a maximum of eight trustees. This is to be the national body for Veterans Cricket throughout New Zealand and trustees will be appointed to represent each cricket region and age group structures for O70's, O60's, O50's, O40's.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 6/10/2023 $260,007 $259,582 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 30/11/2022 $36,716 $35,956 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 13/01/2022 $53,479 $6,030 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 25/10/2020 $131,903 $126,208 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
= Balance Date Change
- This Annual Return will cover 9 months from 1 April 2023 to 31 December 2023.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Warren Guy Trustee 13/08/2023
Fraser John Skinner Trustee 14/06/2022
Del Whyte Trustee 6/07/2020
Jeremy Wilson Trustee 6/07/2020
Johan Morreau Trustee 6/07/2020
Rodney Martin Smith Trustee 6/07/2020
Dave Harle Trustee 3/02/2020
Graeme ( Pierre) Flavell Pierre Flavell Trustee 4/02/2019
John Dean Trustee 4/02/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Grant Baker Trustee 13/08/2023
Rodmey Martin Smith Trustee 30/11/2022
John Cushen` Trustee 14/06/2022

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
1/10/2023 NOC010
12/06/2023 NOC008
12/06/2023 NOC007
30/11/2022 NOC006
9/12/2020 NOC003

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.