Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Pouakani Trust
CC29749
9429042995975
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Te Putahitanga O Nga Ara Trust 30/06/2008
Pouakani Trust 5/04/2014

Address for service

27B Omokoroa Road
Ōmokoroa
Omokoroa
3114

Charity's other details

021434281
https://www.pouakani.co.nz


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

Affiliation with iwi and/or hapū, Focuses on outcomes for Māori

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

This Trust received the Pouakani Treaty Settlement - its mission is: "to improve the well-being of our People" referring to the Pouakani People who are the descendants of the original owners of the Pouakani Block.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Economic development

Education / training / research, Environment / conservation, Social services

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Descendants Of Original Owners Of The Poukai Block

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 15/12/2024 $1,167,072 $1,385,245 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/03/2024 25/03/2024 $494,014 $655,133 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 21/12/2022 $2,609,632 $600,511 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 3/09/2021 $676,448 $1,063,059 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 21/12/2020 $676,448 $1,063,059 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 25/02/2020 $1,582,316 $870,834 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 10/04/2019 $1,842,318 $761,306 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 22/02/2018 $1,412,158 $656,082 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 13/05/2017 $1,310,190 $842,512 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 3/06/2016 $675,235 $2,015,010 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Ledley Kapinga Trustee 28/11/2024
Wally Kingi Trustee 28/11/2024
Chevon Horsford Trustee 6/04/2023
Estrelita Kahikatea Dickinson Trustee 6/04/2023
William Taite Trustee 6/04/2023
Craig Graeme Rangituhua Ahipene Trustee 9/05/2022

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
John Hanita Paki Trustee 28/11/2024
Mandie Brown Trustee 28/11/2024
Rawiri David Wharekura Trustee 22/04/2024
Kimai Genevieve Te Heuheu - Ross Trustee 1/06/2023
Cerreti Peter Mariu Trustee 5/04/2023
Delani John Brown Trustee 5/04/2023
Estrelita Kahikatea Dickinson Trustee 5/04/2023
Lesley Kapinga Trustee 8/05/2022
Nunia Michelle Te Whau Trustee 1/05/2022
Jason Wayne Tapper Trustee 18/10/2021
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
24/02/2025 NOC037
23/04/2024 NOC034
14/06/2023 NOC031
11/04/2023 NOC030
11/04/2023 NOC029
8/02/2023 NOC028
8/02/2023 NOC027
10/05/2022 NOC025
10/05/2022 NOC024
1/11/2021 NOC023
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.