Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Tait Foundation
CC21925
9429042950189
Registered

Registration details

17/03/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 708
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8140
243 Memorial Avenue
Burnside
Christchurch
8053

Charity's other details

021 2671493


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To hold funds to devote or apply to or for any charitable educational purposes in New Zealand. The Trustees are empowered to grant financial assistance towards the organisation establishment or advancement in New Zealand of any universities, schools, education centres or like organisations of purely educational and charitable nature including the funding of scholarships in New Zealand.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Education / training / research

Health

Other (please state)

(Academic/University)

Entity Structure

The Foundation is governed and managed by two trustees, AJK Bruce and RJ Gillatt, who meet regularly.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 4/08/2023 $3,373,022 $1,368,874 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 22/09/2022 $2,290,426 $1,913,495 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 18/09/2021 $2,373,001 $2,259,961 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 23/09/2020 $2,798,110 $1,492,751 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 30/09/2019 $17,940,759 $1,056,174 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 21/08/2018 $2,535,440 $1,270,346 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 6/09/2017 $4,465,790 $2,837,740 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 27/09/2016 $4,887,431 $3,266,246 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 18/08/2015 $2,630,225 $4,678,910 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Alexander Michael George Skinner Trustee 16/03/2024
Katie Klingenberg Trustee 16/03/2024
Alan James Kenneth Bruce Trustee 27/02/1997

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Ronald Joseph Gillatt Trustee 21/02/2024
Trevor Francis Thornton Trustee 6/09/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/03/2024 NOC017
4/07/2021 NOC013
25/01/2017 NOC008
28/10/2015 NOC006
18/08/2015 NOC005
2/07/2014 NOC004
26/05/2010 AR003

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.