pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Heart Kids New Zealand Incorporated
Heart Kids
CC20102
9429042696902
Registered

Registration details

22/11/2007
November 30
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Heart Children New Zealand Incorporated 23/11/2007
@Heart Incorporated 21/12/2010
Heart Kids New Zealand Incorporated 26/05/2014

Address for service

PO Box 108034
Symonds Street
Auckland
1150
C/- MTM Accounting
Level 3, 191 Thorndon Quay
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

0800543943


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Heart Kids seeks to provide lifelong support to all those affected by Congenital Heart Defects. We understand that Heart Children may need help and support not only during their early years, but throughout their lives The purposes of Heart Kids are: (a)To support Heart Children and their Whanau. (b)To give practical and financial support to Heart Children and their Parents. (c)To educate Heart Children and their Whanau about CHD and the support available to them. (d)To educate the public about the needs of Heart Children and their Whanau. (e)To fund equipment for Heart Children. (f)To provide representational advocacy for Heart Children and their Whanau. (g)To carry on any other charitable purpose which may seem to Heart Kids capable of being conveniently carried on by Heart Kids. Heart Kids' purposes are exclusively charitable, except insofar as Heart Kids may undertake, in order to achieve its charitable purposes, activities that are ancillary to its charitable purposes.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

People with disabilities

Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Fund-raising, Disability - Support of Children with Heart Defects

Children / young people

People with disabilities, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

A national organisation which has 11 affiliated local branches throughout New Zealand.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 May 2008 under section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 May 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/05/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/05/2022 29/05/2022 $3,113,012 $2,933,943
31/08/2021 27/08/2021 $3,003,190 $2,811,659
31/08/2020 18/08/2020 $3,283,223 $3,129,336
31/05/2019 Member of 'Heart Children New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/05/2018 Member of 'Heart Children New Zealand Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/05/2017 Member of '' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/05/2016 9/04/2016 $2,150,141 $2,017,679
31/05/2015 26/05/2015 $1,401,931 $1,432,548
31/05/2014 26/05/2014 $1,338,393 $1,334,822

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Arna Lynda Craig Board Member 25/07/2022
Katie McRae Board Member 25/07/2022
Rachael Marie Lovelock Board Member 25/07/2022
Neven Harland Board Member 28/05/2022
Ashlee Elizabeth McCormick Board Member 22/10/2021
Steven Abley Board Member 10/09/2021
Robyn Kaye Wickenden Board Member 29/05/2021
Donna Maria Jujnovich Board Member 26/05/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Lisa Maree Oakley Board Member 26/11/2022
Jennifer Scott Board Member 7/06/2022
Craig McDowell Board Member 30/05/2022
Michael Green Board Member 28/05/2022
Rebecca Margaret Horgan Board Member 28/05/2022
Kelly Irene Douglas Board Member 30/04/2022
Bryan Andrew McEwen Board Member 3/11/2021
Alexander James Wilson Board Member 29/05/2021
Emma Margaret Olphert Lawler Board Member 29/05/2021
Melissa Lee Broomhall Board Member 29/05/2021

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
28/11/2022 NOC041
19/08/2022 NOC040
11/08/2022 NOC039
31/05/2022 NOC038
8/11/2021 NOC036
2/11/2021 NOC035
4/10/2021 NOC034
26/07/2021 NOC032
26/06/2021 NOC029
30/07/2020 NOC026

Charity Documents


Notices

This entity was removed from a single entity group (CC20103) on 5 June 2019.