Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of SPCA New Zealand .

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
SPCA Investments Limited
SPCA Social Enterprises Limited
The Royal New Zealand Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals Incorporated

Group Details


SPCA New Zealand

Registration details

Registered
31/07/2019
CC56833
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 15349
New Lynn
Auckland
0640
6 Rawiri Place
Hobsonville
Auckland
0618

Group's other details

(09)8276094


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 20/12/2023 $63,486,450 $64,108,520 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 20/12/2022 $50,905,000 $59,272,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 14/12/2021 $82,451,000 $48,419,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 7/12/2020 $50,430,000 $47,322,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 16/12/2019 $46,474,000 $44,023,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 28/08/2019 $33,038,000 $29,983,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To advance animal welfare and prevent cruelty

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Care / protection of animals

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Emergency / disaster relief, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Animals

Children / young people, General public, Children / young people

Entity Structure

On 1 November 2017 SPCA centres voted to become part of 'One' SPCA (RNZSPCA - CC 22705, Inc No. 218546). All centres were previously seperate Incorporated Societies. Queries to board.secretary@spca.nz

Group Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this group.

Group Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No group documents.