Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Aoraki Multicultural Council Incorporated
Multicultural Aoraki formerly Aoraki Migrant Centre
CC44614
9429043164080
Registered

Registration details

12/07/2010
June 30

Address for service

4 Latter Street
Timaru
7910

Charity's other details

036877332
https://www.facebook.com/multiculturalaoraki


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Aoraki Multicultural Council works to build bridges of Cultural Harmony. The mission statement underpins the following objectives: Community wellbeing & understanding through education and the promotion of understanding - To promote goodwill, tolerance and understanding among people of diverse ethnic cultures - To work together in our community with aim of fostering a tolerant and harmonious society - Increase knowlededge of different cultures which will assist to breakdown prejudices. The diverse ethnic mix will bring more vibrancey to Aoraki community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Provides religious services / activities

Social services

Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Arts / culture / heritage, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Migrants / refugees

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Religious groups

Entity Structure

The Council comes under the umbrella of New Zealand Federation of Multicultural Councils Inc. 8 committee members constitute our governance board, including 5 executive officer positions: Chairperson, Vice Chairperson, Secretary and Treasurer. Our operations are managed by seven paid employees. Volunteers support us with our various activities

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 29/11/2023 $1,188,159 $982,723 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 14/09/2022 $636,762 $472,637 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 23/08/2021 $305,207 $283,915 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 10/03/2021 $168,096 $101,076 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 19/08/2019 $58,312 $60,283 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 29/08/2018 $67,552 $65,425 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 4/09/2017 $78,311 $69,931 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 29/09/2016 $70,283 $61,695 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 16/09/2015 $37,971 $52,030 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2014 30/09/2014 30/09/2014 $36,053 $9,196 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination
= Balance Date Change
- This annual return will cover the financial period between 1 April 2022- 30 June 2023 (15 months) due to a balance date change.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anna Leger Committee member 21/11/2023
Nadine Girgis Committee member 1/08/2023
Beth Stewart-Wright Chair 1/06/2023
Jasveen Singh Committee Member 3/03/2023
Elizabeth Park Vice-Chair 18/10/2022
Martin Deon Reynecke Secretary 21/09/2021
Satish Lata Treasurer 10/03/2019
Antony Howey Committee Member 28/07/2013
Kate Wright Chairperson 28/07/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Steven Gareth Jones Exec Member 15/08/2023
Barbara Jane Gilchrist Exec Member 1/05/2023
Vaishnavi Gupte Secretary 1/12/2022
Vivien Grace Wood Committee Member 1/12/2022
Gregory O'Brien Chair 2/09/2022
Sina Latu Executive Member 25/07/2022
Kashyap Hari Treasurer 1/06/2021
Sharon Maree Taylor Exec Member 16/04/2021
Belinda Dewe Executive 17/11/2020
Hacer Tekinkaya Executive Member 17/11/2020
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
10/01/2024 NOC022
13/09/2023 NOC020
27/02/2023 NOC019
21/12/2022 NOC018
8/11/2021 NOC016
18/09/2019 NOC013
11/03/2019 NOC011
2/03/2018 NOC008
11/11/2015 NOC005
24/10/2014 NOC004
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.