pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Bike Auckland Incorporated
Bike Auckland
CC23026
9429043169412
Registered

Registration details

15/04/2008
June 30
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Cycle Action Auckland Incorporated 16/04/2008
Bike Auckland Incorporated 29/10/2015

Address for service

PO Box 78426
Grey Lynn
Auckland
1245
Level 17 Commercial Bay Tower
11-19 Customs Street West
Auckland CBD
Auckland
1010

Charity's other details

Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/BikeAKL/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The primary objective of Bike Auckland is to promote cycling as a healthy, equitable, environmentally sound, sustainable and convenient form of transport.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Environment / conservation

Education / training / research, Sport / recreation, Promotion of volunteering, Sustainable Transport

General public

Transport agencies

Entity Structure

Bike Auckland is an incorporated society, incorporated in accordance with the Incorporated Societies Act 1908 and a charitable entity registered under the Charities Act 2005.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31/12/2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31/12/2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2022 26/01/2023 $277,079 $210,621
31/12/2021 20/05/2022 $263,460 $225,105
31/12/2020 22/02/2021 $229,545 $191,045
31/12/2019 16/12/2019 $323,085 $317,263
31/12/2018 18/10/2018 $302,080 $258,584
31/12/2017 12/03/2018 $101,924 $108,515
31/12/2016 22/12/2016 $68,096 $70,617
31/12/2015 21/12/2015 $22,308 $18,505
31/12/2014 23/02/2015 $8,797 $8,418

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Juan Pablo Gonzales Espinosa Treasurer 1/07/2023
Karen Barbara Hormann Chair 20/05/2022
Duncan Rutherfurd Laidlaw Deputy Chair 28/09/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Tony Mitchell Chair 8/06/2023
Paula Heather Luijken Secretary 28/05/2022
Greer Juul Rasmussen Treasurer 31/01/2022
Richard Barter Committee Member 31/01/2022
Max Robitzsch committee member 31/12/2021
Barbara Alison Elizabeth Cuthbert Chair Person 28/11/2021
Jane Admore Committee Memebr 30/06/2020
Ben Lenihan Deputy Chair Person 30/06/2019
Stephen John Southall committee member 30/06/2019
Paul Shortland Treasurer 29/11/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/07/2023 NOC031
15/03/2023 NOC030
28/06/2022 NOC028
8/06/2022 NOC026
19/10/2018 NOC021
23/12/2016 NOC018
4/07/2016 NOC016
30/05/2016 NOC015
30/05/2016 NOC014
22/12/2015 NOC013

Charity Documents