pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Robson Hanan Trust
JustSpeak
CC43460
9429043259854
Registered

Registration details

21/01/2010
December 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Amos Trust 22/01/2010
Robson Hanan Trust 5/03/2010

Address for service

39 Webb Street
Mount Cook
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/justspeaknz/
https://www.instagram.com/justspeaknz/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

JustSpeak works to facilitate a movement of youth for transformative change in the ‘criminal justice system’ towards a fair, just, and compassionate Aotearoa. JustSpeak develops tools, resources, spaces and support to facilitate a public conversation on criminal justice informed by evidence and lived experience. JustSpeak works cooperatively with others in the youth volunteer and development area particularly relating to a just and equitable justice system.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research, Undertakes Research

Other (please state)

(Justice), Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Social services

General public

Children / young people, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau, Justice Stakeholders

Entity Structure

The leadership of the Trust is provided by the board (governance) and the director (management). The board comprises 7 trustees selected to represent diversity of experience and expertise. JustSpeak was launched in 2011 as a network of young people speaking up and speaking out for a new generation of thinkers. At the end of 2021 4 staff members are employed by the Trust: Operations Manager, Campaigner, Fundraiser, and Capacity and Advocacy Lead.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2010 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2011.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2022 2/08/2022 $319,202 $336,749
31/07/2021 30/06/2021 $253,661 $277,401
24/07/2020 31/08/2020 $397,812 $247,257
30/06/2019 12/09/2019 $256,754 $204,059
30/06/2018 5/09/2018 $228,943 $197,092
30/06/2017 24/08/2017 $221,844 $206,821
30/06/2016 30/08/2016 $160,481 $262,141
30/06/2015 20/10/2015 $415,108 $418,940
31/12/2013 16/12/2013 $318,666 $249,651
31/12/2012 15/11/2012 $285,899 $288,587

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Adrienne Thompson Treasurer 6/04/2022
Francesca Hart Secretary 6/04/2022
Rachel Hyde Chair 6/04/2022
Moana Cole Board Member 16/11/2019
Anne Elise Mere Waapu Board Member 17/08/2019
Laura Hayley O'Connell Board Member 1/08/2018
Pam Thorburn Board member 2/09/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Alexandra Kirsten O'Connor Volunteer Representative 6/04/2022
Jordan Amy Anderson Chair 6/04/2022
Tamatha-Kaye Erin Paul Board Member 6/04/2022
Andrea Black Treasurer 23/03/2021
Julia Spelman Board member 17/08/2019
Julia Whaipooti trustee 31/05/2019
Robert Kinsela Workman Trustee 31/12/2018
Tracey Kathleen Dorothy Mcintosh Trustee 31/10/2018
Kate Georgina Stone Board member 31/08/2018
Philip Joseph McCarthy Trustee 31/12/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/04/2022 NOC025
7/07/2021 NOC024
19/04/2021 NOC020
24/09/2019 NOC018
29/06/2018 NOC016
11/05/2016 NOC012
13/01/2016 NOC011
5/01/2016 NOC010
17/03/2015 NOC009
17/03/2014 NOC008

Charity Documents