pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of The Internet Safety Group.

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Hector's World Limited
Netsafe Incorporated

Group Details


The Internet Safety Group

Registration details

Registered
7/05/2008
CC24057
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 124
Shortland Street
Auckland Central
Auckland
1140
Level 2
59 High Street
Auckland Central
Auckland
1010

Group's other details

0508638732


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2021 25/11/2021 $4,064,456 $4,135,302
31/12/2020 17/11/2020 $3,940,875 $4,026,158
31/12/2019 11/12/2019 $4,011,785 $3,779,250
31/12/2018 17/10/2018 $4,037,116 $3,743,894
31/12/2017 11/01/2018 $4,698,103 $3,607,045
30/09/2016 20/12/2017 $845,945 $924,663
31/12/2015 Please refer to the group member(s) to view the Annual Returns.
30/09/2014 21/10/2014 $130 $744
31/12/2013 Please refer to the group member(s) to view the Annual Returns.
31/12/2012 Please refer to the group member(s) to view the Annual Returns.

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

NetSafe is an independent non-profit organisation that promotes confident, safe, and responsible use of online technologies

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Education / training / research

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, Family / whanau, Children / young people

Entity Structure

Incorporated society

Group Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the group, for example, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/12/2017 NOC002

Group Documents