pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


ME/CFS Support (Auckland) Incorporated
ME Auckland
CC50218
9429043251667
Registered

Registration details

11/02/2014
June 30

Address for service

Unit 29
Tuscany Towers
New Lynn
Auckland
0600

Charity's other details

0800 632 553


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To improve the lives of Aucklanders affected by Myalgic Encephalomyelitis, also known as Chronic Fatigue Syndrome (ME/CFS). Includes related conditions and carers / relatives of those with ME/CFS.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

People with disabilities

People with disabilities

Entity Structure

Governance: Members of ME Auckland elect a Board which includes President, Vice President, Treasurer, Secretary and up to eight other Board Members. Management: The Board employs two part-time Support Workers for 25 hours per week, contracts a professional supervisor for four hours per month and an administrator for five hours per week. As at 30 June 2021 there are around 20 volunteers. As at 30 June 2020, there were around 20 volunteers.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2021 31/12/2021 $39,859 $40,944
31/12/2020 31/10/2020 $49,679 $39,323
31/12/2019 21/12/2019 $36,888 $46,977
31/12/2018 6/12/2018 $31,480 $33,206
31/12/2017 10/12/2017 $26,103 $17,601
31/12/2016 28/12/2016 $15,441 $5,235
31/12/2015 3/02/2016 $5,259 $1,607
31/12/2014 22/12/2014 $2,292 $450

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Grace Ross Secretary 3/11/2021
John Loof Director 9/06/2021
Saul Chambers Director 14/04/2021
Anil Kumar Luthra Director 2/08/2020
Neerja Mahindra Treasurer 2/08/2020
Alison Kate Duder Vice President 20/03/2020
Patrick Neil Hadfield President 18/07/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Joahnna Esguerra Director 16/06/2021
Emma Jean Nelson secretary 21/03/2021
Frances O'Connor Secretary 8/03/2021
Peter Mancer President 10/10/2020
Sherryl Ann Mendoza Gibbs Director 31/08/2020
Natalia Valentino Board Member 31/03/2020
Regina Bettina Henning Treasurer 28/10/2019
Stephanie Jones Board Member 17/01/2019
Yvonne Bristow Board Member 6/10/2018
Wendy Mary Matthews Board Member 17/12/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/12/2021 NOC027
18/08/2021 NOC026
18/05/2021 NOC025
19/04/2021 NOC024
14/03/2021 NOC023
9/03/2021 NOC022
29/11/2020 NOC021
2/06/2020 NOC019
1/06/2020 NOC018
15/03/2020 NOC017

Charity Documents