Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Katoa Connect Trust
Katoa Connect, 20/20 Trust
CC24748
9429043028337
Registered

Registration details

22/05/2008
June 30

Name change history

Name Effective Date
2020 Communications Trust 23/05/2008
Katoa Connect Trust 14/05/2024

Address for service

PO Box 21241
Rototuna
Rototuna North
Hamilton
3256
110 Dixon Street
Masterton
5810

Charity's other details

0800 272020


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide leadership and work with communities to deliver programmes that contribute to New Zealanders’ digital literacy, skills and inclusion. The 20/20 Trust addresses issues resulting from the increasing use of information and communication technologies (ICTs), initiating, proving and delivering community based solutions.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provides leadership and a range of programmes that seek to ensure all New Zealanders can participate in the digital world.)

Community development

Family / whanau

Children / young people, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

The Trust is governed by a Board that sets strategic direction. Operations are managed by a Chief Executive and delivery is made by a national team of managers, staff, contractors and delivery partners.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 2/12/2023 $3,386,862 $2,698,635 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 6/11/2022 $3,925,231 $2,772,163 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 15/12/2021 $2,815,623 $2,503,356 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 30/01/2022 $2,361,648 $1,785,048 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 22/12/2019 $1,461,894 $1,427,082 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 4/12/2018 $1,884,506 $2,041,112 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 7/12/2017 $4,470,628 $4,451,581 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 28/12/2016 $4,150,397 $4,264,200 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 31/12/2015 $4,064,333 $4,080,703 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2014 31/12/2014 20/10/2014 $3,772,011 $3,765,728 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Craig Young Trustee 19/10/2021
Guy Alexander Trustee 19/10/2021
Lesley Hoskin Chair 19/10/2021
Megan Tunks Trustee 19/10/2021
Miriam Walker Deputy Chair 19/10/2021
Semi Asafo Trustee 19/10/2021
Te Omeka Morehu Trustee 19/10/2021
Margaret McLeod Trustee 18/02/2020

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Fritz Napoleone Evile Chair 6/12/2023
Laurence John Millar Trustee 6/12/2023
David Barrow Treasurer 23/02/2022
Barbara Bilcich Trustee 15/08/2021
Angela Lim Trustee 24/06/2021
Melissa Hall Trustee 27/05/2021
Selwyn Screen Treasurer 31/03/2021
Angela Hauk-Willis Trustee 25/02/2021
Saia Mataele Trustee 10/12/2020
Catherine Cotter Trustee 11/10/2019
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/05/2024 NOC040
31/01/2024 NOC039
25/01/2024 NOC036
20/08/2023 NOC034
27/03/2023 NOC033
6/11/2022 NOC031
26/04/2022 NOC030
5/12/2021 NOC028
10/11/2021 NOC027
28/06/2021 NOC026
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.