Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Grandparents Raising Grandchildren Trust New Zealand
CC20205
9429043078165
Registered

Registration details

9/12/2007
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 34892
Birkenhead
Auckland
746
162 Mokoia Road
Chatswood
Auckland
0626

Charity's other details

0800 472 637
(09)4806572


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our vision and purpose To tātou moemoeā me te kaupapa . Our mission is to provide specialised services and programmes that empower and strengthen grandparent and whānau care families so they can raise resilient and healthy tamariki and rangatahi. Te whakamana i ngā tupuna me ngā whānau, ki te whakatipu tamariki pakari me te hauora me te rangatahi. Ko tā mātou whāinga ko te whakarato ratonga ngaio e whakakaha ana i te whānau

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Education / training / research

Community development, Social services

Older people

Children / young people, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

The Board of Grandparents Raising Grandchildren Trust New Zealand ("GRG") is made up of up to eight committed professional volunteers who have a diverse range of life, parenting, cultural, legal, business, governance and management skills and experience. They set the strategic direction of the Trust and meet bi-monthly to oversee its progress

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 28/11/2023 $815,867 $888,082 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 16/01/2023 $798,879 $724,341 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 15/12/2021 $808,561 $799,083 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 29/09/2020 $573,651 $586,108 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 31/10/2019 1/11/2019 $546,952 $526,755 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 28/09/2018 $506,464 $474,852 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 20/08/2017 $521,420 $500,522 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 14/07/2016 $376,526 $395,472 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 31/07/2015 $365,333 $352,355 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2014 30/09/2014 19/06/2014 $390,465 $377,742 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination
= Balance Date Change
- This Annual Return will cover 15 months from 1 April 2020 to 30 June 2021.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Duane Craig Trembath Trustee 13/12/2022
Laurie Dean Porima Trustee 13/12/2022
Zachary Johns Trustee 13/12/2022
Daniel Michael Bidois Trustee 1/06/2021
Pru Etcheverry Chair & Trustee 21/07/2017
Jo-Anne Thomas Trustee 18/02/2014
Judith McKay Trustee 19/02/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Niwa Nuri Trustee 13/12/2022
Des Brennan Trustee 28/06/2022
Jocelyn Bray Trustee 28/06/2022
Sharon Richardson Trustee 1/11/2021
Diane Vivian Trustee 23/10/2018
David White Trustee 27/03/2018
Deborah Gillies Trustee 23/06/2015
Katrine Marie Bundle Trustee 21/04/2015
Peter Hamish Talbot Trustee 21/10/2014
Mary Sholto Tunks Trustee 17/06/2014
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
17/04/2023 NOC030
11/01/2022 NOC027
16/06/2021 NOC025
9/06/2021 NOC024
27/09/2019 NOC021
25/02/2019 NOC020
29/05/2018 NOC018
25/05/2018 NOC017
25/05/2018 NOC016
30/11/2015 NOC013
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.