pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


International Word of Life Trust
CC43849
9429042646167
Registered

Registration details

18/03/2010
January 31

Address for service

PO Box 15242
Hamilton Central
Hamilton
3244
28 Dinsdale Road
Dinsdale
Hamilton
3204

Charity's other details

07 846 2101
07 846 2101

Oceania

Fiji, Samoa


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Partner with local Churches to evangelise and disciple youth.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Sport / recreation, International activities, Promotion of volunteering

Children / young people

Voluntary bodies other than charities, Religious groups

Entity Structure

International Word of Life Trust is a not for profit organisation governed by its Board of Trustees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 July 2010 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 July 2011.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 7/09/2021 $1,110,177 $849,990
13/11/2020 13/11/2020 $983,948 $945,872
31/07/2019 26/07/2019 $766,992 $750,568
31/07/2018 21/06/2018 $664,123 $586,427
31/07/2017 28/06/2017 $558,920 $515,074
31/07/2016 23/06/2016 $493,739 $468,679
31/07/2015 5/03/2015 $509,984 $443,602
31/07/2014 12/03/2014 $459,475 $431,446
31/07/2013 5/06/2013 $351,153 $342,458
31/07/2012 23/03/2012 $351,153 $382,602

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
David John Alexander Gow Trustee/Field Coordinator 27/11/2020
Christopher John Broadbent Board Chairman/Trustee 9/08/2019
Christine Joy Edwards Officer/Trustee 2/10/2018
Daniel Wells Lamb Trustee 16/06/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jeremy John Suisted Trustee 15/06/2021
Thomas Allister Philip Mcivor Director 24/07/2020
Danelle Joy Diprose Trustee 9/06/2020
Bevan Robert Smith Trustee 21/10/2019
Malcolm John Rea Trustee 4/03/2019
Graeme Victor Neilson Trustee 16/04/2018
Bevan Robert Smith Trustee 30/01/2017
Thomas Allister Philip Mcivor Director 30/01/2017
Andrew Ian Nicol Trustee 16/06/2015
Andrew Ian Nicol Trustee 16/06/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/06/2021 NOC022
25/06/2021 NOC021
27/11/2020 NOC019
12/11/2020 NOC017
20/12/2019 NOC016
26/03/2019 NOC014
11/10/2018 NOC013
27/04/2018 NOC011
8/06/2016 NOC009
6/03/2015 NOC008

Charity Documents