pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Marine Reach
Marine Reach
CC23109
9429042928256
Registered

Registration details

16/04/2008
December 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Marine Reach - Youth with a Mission 17/04/2008
Marine Reach - Youth With A Mission 8/05/2009
Marine Reach 27/10/2017

Address for service

PO Box 1028
Seventh Avenue
Tauranga
3144
237 Warner Road
RD 3
Oropi
Tauranga
3173

Charity's other details

07 5433787
07 5795637
Facebook icon image
marinereach-tauranga

Oceania

Fiji, Samoa, Vanuatu

Asia

Cambodia, Philippines


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Provides services ( e.g. care/counselling ) Provides services, sponsors/undertakes research, Provides human resources, provides religious services/activities, other health services.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides religious services / activities, Health services

Health

Education / training / research, Religious activities, International activities, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Children / young people, Other charities, Religious groups, Indigents in Foreign countries

Entity Structure

charitable trust ( find attached Entity Structure )

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2020 - - - - To be filed
30/11/2019 5/11/2019 $2,239,948 $2,132,452
31/10/2018 24/09/2018 $2,381,501 $2,501,533
30/06/2017 29/08/2017 $2,682,128 $2,086,660
30/06/2016 29/06/2016 $3,229,670 $3,044,183
30/06/2015 3/08/2015 $2,178,456 $1,980,685
30/06/2014 6/06/2014 $1,569,483 $2,352,122
30/06/2013 21/06/2013 $1,190,155 $915,705
30/06/2012 25/05/2012 $374,747 $167,638
30/06/2011 25/07/2011 $674,434 $647,566

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Catherine Anne Hosking Trustee 4/06/2018
Daniel James Snyder Trustee 4/06/2018
Jesus Misa Trustee 23/08/2001
David Cowie Trustee 17/09/1990

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Lisa Elaine Abrams Trustee 3/05/2019
Barry Turner Trustee 4/06/2018
Graeme Elvin Trustee 4/06/2018
Huikakahu Brian Kawe Trustee 4/06/2018
Michael A Mears National Director 22/11/2015
Roy Burnett Trustee 19/10/2015
Graham Brown Trustee 3/12/2012
John Brignall Trustee 31/12/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/10/2018 NOC017
7/11/2017 NOC015
30/08/2017 NOC013
22/03/2016 NOC011
23/11/2015 NOC010
7/12/2012 NOC005
25/05/2012 AR006
25/07/2011 AR005
15/11/2010 NOC004
30/06/2010 AR004

Charity Documents