pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Environment Conservation And Outdoor Education Trust
ECOED
CC27154
9429043106905
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

73 Raffles Street
Napier South
Napier
4110

Charity's other details

06 877 1213


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To restore and protect North Island Brown kiwi To provide educational talks and activities in particular relation to habitat restoration and kiwi conservation To promote outdoor education

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Kiwi Conservation And Outdoor / Environment Education), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Environment / conservation

Education / training / research, Community development, Care / protection of animals, Outdoor Education

Children / young people

Animals, General public, Hawkes Bay Youth

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2020 30/06/2020 $87,165 $71,737
30/09/2019 6/09/2019 $41,936 $33,184
30/09/2018 5/11/2018 $39,934 $33,629
30/09/2017 5/11/2018 $35,520 $24,659
30/09/2016 3/08/2018 $52,405 $37,690
30/09/2015 21/10/2015 $48,324 $46,655
30/09/2014 17/11/2014 $94,818 $83,449
30/09/2013 17/11/2014 $70,000 $100,500
30/09/2012 16/08/2012 $142,493 $143,111

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Reece O'Leary Trustee 25/05/2021
Marilyn Judith Wright Trustee 4/04/2019
Phil Kay Trustee 18/05/2004
Matthew Lawson Trustee 12/12/2002

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Brian Pritchard Trustee 15/06/2018
Alastair Bramley Trustee 31/03/2016
Arthur Thorpe Gemmell Trustee 31/03/2016
Barbara Arnott Trustee 31/03/2016
Diane Taylor Trustee 31/03/2016
Drew Broadley Trustee 31/03/2016
Rex McIntyre Trustee 31/03/2016
Timothy Gilbertson Trustee 14/09/2010
Deborah Margaret Turner Trustee 4/07/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
8/06/2021 NOC017
11/04/2021 NOC016
23/05/2019 NOC013
20/01/2012 NOC006
20/01/2012 NOC005
5/11/2010 NOC004
23/09/2010 AR003
21/08/2009 AR002
18/12/2008 NOC003
5/12/2008 NOC002

Charity Documents