Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Saturday Music (Palmerston North)
CC29243
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

82 Worcester Street
Ashhurst
4810

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The aims of Saturday Music are to: provide an opportunity for children from 4 years of age until the end of school year 8 to explore and develop their creative musical potential. provide tuition in practical, basic music skills. provide opportunities for musical performance. maintain a supportive and affordable community music environment.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Education / training / research

Arts / culture / heritage

Children / young people

Entity Structure

It is administered by a supervisory committee and is hosted by Palmerston North Intermediate Normal School, operating under the regulations of the Ministry of Education.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 31/07/2022 $51,279 $52,509 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 24/10/2021 $46,868 $49,756 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 1/09/2020 $49,549 $37,889 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 1/09/2020 $63,888 $38,488 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 20/02/2019 $45,765 $45,854 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 20/02/2019 $50,900 $43,333 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 14/04/2017 $44,538 $41,215 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2014 30/06/2015 14/04/2017 $42,948 $42,736 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2013 30/06/2014 24/11/2014 $40,762 $43,624 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Nigel Keith Tongs Director 1/04/2016
Annika Meredith McBrearty Treasurer 1/10/2014
Andrew Gilbert Griffiths Secretary 26/04/2012
Mary Therese Kriechbaum Committee Member 2/02/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Emma Minchin Assistant Director 18/06/2021
Keiko Uchidate Assistant Director 20/09/2019
Karen Carter Chairperson 31/12/2016
Rosanne Louise Churchouse Committee Member 30/04/2016
Catherine Margaret Duxfield Treasurer 1/10/2014
John Leonard Schwabe Secretary 26/04/2012
Christine Barbara Dykstra Administrative Director 2/02/2012
Jennifer Noelene Orange Committee Member 30/06/2011
Amanda Maree Houlahan Staff Representative (Committee Member) 3/02/2010
Kathryn Anne Handley Parent Representative 24/06/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/04/2017 NOC005
29/09/2011 AR004
5/11/2010 AR003
1/07/2009 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.