pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Keirunga Gardens Arts and Crafts Society Incorporated
CC29940
9429042656203
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
February 28

Address for service

6 Puflett Road
Havelock North
4130

Charity's other details

0272079999
Facebook icon image
facebook.com/keirungahavelocknorth


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Provide Buildings, Facilities & Open Space for Learning and the Practice of Arts and Crafts

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Home for learning and the practise of arts and crafts

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research, Community development

General public

Children / young people, Older people

Entity Structure

Incorporated Society consisting of a Chair, Secretary, Treasurer and other office-holders. The Society is a registered charity.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 April 2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 April 2010.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/08/2022 20/06/2022 $83,177 $100,817
31/08/2021 26/08/2021 $75,903 $100,972
31/08/2020 23/09/2020 $100,842 $71,906
31/08/2019 16/10/2019 $206,930 $30,219
31/08/2018 9/09/2018 $892,558 $92,036
31/08/2017 3/09/2018 $892,558 $92,036
30/04/2017 5/12/2016 $65,068 $54,938
30/04/2016 20/11/2015 $58,423 $52,858
30/04/2015 4/02/2015 $50,591 $34,473
30/04/2014 24/01/2014 $47,567 $36,623

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
DON CASAGRANDA Board Member 28/02/2022
Eve Casagranda BOARD MEMBER 28/02/2022
Brenda Haldane Board Member 18/08/2021
Pamela Judith Thomson Secretary 18/08/2021
Elizabeth-Marie Anna Joyce Nes Board Member 22/06/2021
Jacqueline Supra Board member 28/04/2021
Chris George Moore Chairperson 23/09/2020
Richard Thomas Moorhead Board Member 19/08/2020

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jane O'Callaghan Board Member 16/02/2022
Julie Henderson Secretary 15/09/2021
Trevor Maurice Rose Board Member 15/07/2021
Gillian Ann Receveur Board Member 11/11/2020
Tricia Anne Johnson Administrator 6/10/2020
Juliet Catherine Cottrell President 29/02/2020
Rachel Marie Bashnick Treasurer 29/02/2020
Warren Elliott Vice-President 13/09/2019
John Matthew Eaden Vice-President 10/04/2018
Paul Aaron Sampson Treasurer 14/03/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
24/03/2022 NOC029
10/11/2021 NOC028
10/11/2021 NOC027
11/11/2020 NOC025
6/10/2020 NOC024
7/05/2018 NOC019
12/04/2017 NOC018
16/03/2017 NOC017
15/03/2017 NOC016
15/03/2017 NOC015

Charity Documents