Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


MENZSHED NEW ZEALAND Incorporated
MENZSHED NZ
CC49919
9429043319879
Registered

Registration details

17/10/2013
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
MENZSHED New Zealand Incorporated 17/10/2013
MENZSHED NEW ZEALAND Incorporated 21/04/2023

Address for service

17 Lakehouse Crescent
Richmond
7020

Charity's other details

027 8822448


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

MENZSHED New Zealand is Incorporated under the Incorporated Societies Act 1908. Its purpose is to meet the needs of its member sheds by: Providing support and resources for member sheds and emerging groups; Providing central contact point for member sheds; Maintaining a national register of sheds in N; Providing benefits to member sheds, (discounted group purchasing); Providing quality health & safety information; Organise national conference & regional networking; supporting member sheds.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Health

Community development, Promotion of volunteering, Men's health and wellbeing

Other (please state)

(Men (mainly retired men)), Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, General public

Entity Structure

MENZSHED NZ is overseen by an elected National Executive Committee which manages its operations.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 20/04/2023 $4,719 $4,109 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 21/06/2022 $3,733 $1,512 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 23/06/2021 $2,955 $4,251 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 1/08/2020 $10,462 $3,166 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 31/07/2019 $9,160 $23,691 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 25/08/2018 $21,318 $1,483 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 3/08/2017 $6,671 $12,759 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 29/11/2016 $17,049 $4,070 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 10/08/2015 $1,566 $807 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2014 30/09/2014 28/06/2014 $775 $656 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
David Atkinson Treasurer 15/04/2023
Roger Bowman Secretary 15/04/2023
Trevor Andrew Scott Chairman 18/05/2020
David Clive Broadhead Regional Representative 29/11/2019
Murray Graham Campbell Regional Representative 12/11/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Keith Maxwell Dickson Region 2 Representative 14/05/2023
Trevor Andrew Scott Region 4 Representative 19/04/2023
Peter Thomas Blackler Treasurer 15/04/2023
Roger Bowman Secretary 17/05/2021
John Bush Executive Member 18/05/2020
Raymond Hall Chairman 26/06/2018
James Neil McArthur Region 5 Representative 29/04/2018
Ross McEwan Region 1 Representative 29/04/2018
Jeffery Wakelin Region 3 Representative 15/05/2017
Robert Hall Region 2 Representative 15/05/2017
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
24/05/2023 NOC016
12/05/2023 NOC015
21/04/2023 NOC014
19/04/2023 NOC012
19/04/2023 NOC011
3/09/2021 NOC009
13/08/2015 NOC002
13/08/2015 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.