pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Nest Collective NZ Charitable Trust
The Nest Collective NZ
CC58638
N/A
Registered

Registration details

23/12/2020
December 31

Address for service

9 Ron Deal Way
Epuni
Lower Hutt
5011

Charity's other details

Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/thenestcollectivenz


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Nest Collective NZ Charitable Trust’s purpose is to relieve the effects of poverty and act for the public good by supplying packs to parents, families and caregivers of babies and children in need, and those who support them. Our packs cover all the bases for babies' and childrens' needs.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Social services

General public

Entity Structure

The Trust Board acts as a central organising body for Branches across the country (presently in Auckland, Waikato, Gisborne and Christchurch) to facilitate their activities, including by handling the accounts, rent payments for premises, and financial reporting for all Branches.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2022 20/05/2022 $78,413 $68,372
30/06/2021 - - - - Exempt

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kate Prickett Trustee 14/05/2021
Amelia Zara Crundwell Trustee 27/01/2021
Nicolette Marguerite Elizabeth Luke Trustee 9/01/2021
Elizabeth Caroline Mary Priscott Trustee 9/12/2020
Girol Karacaoglu Trustee (Chairperson) 9/12/2020
Glen Andrew Williams Trustee (Treasurer) 9/12/2020
Natalia Peruz Virginia Karacaoglu Trustee (Managing Trustee, Secretary) 9/12/2020

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
12/05/2021 NOC001

Charity Documents