pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Youth Education and Training Initiatives (YETI) Nepal Trust
YETI Nepal Trust
CC21941
9429043175901
Registered

Registration details

18/03/2008
March 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
The Destitute Children's Home - Pokhara Charitable Trust 19/03/2008
Youth Education and Training Initiatives (YETI) Nepal Trust 1/04/2013

Address for service

PO Box 315
Wellington
6140
17 Robertson Street
Owhiro Bay
Wellington
6023

Charity's other details

04 3836931
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/YETITrustnz/

Asia

Nepal


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To make grants to youth, organisations (including schools or other charities), that provides finance/funding for Educational Purposes.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds)

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides Finance/Funding for Educational Purposes

Fund-raising

Social services, International activities

Children / young people

Entity Structure

Charitable trust managed and operated from Wellington

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 10/07/2022 $18,789 $13,251
30/09/2021 15/08/2021 $25,637 $21,511
30/09/2020 9/08/2020 $18,848 $18,041
30/09/2019 19/07/2019 $14,807 $9,097
30/09/2018 5/09/2018 $9,554 $6,577
30/09/2017 12/09/2017 $10,314 $11,022
30/09/2016 25/08/2016 $19,939 $21,048
30/09/2015 25/08/2015 $10,781 $8,504
30/09/2014 21/08/2014 $9,539 $13,634
30/09/2013 8/09/2013 $16,713 $11,228

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jinhee Jung Trustee 1/02/2020
Susan Guthrie Trustee 1/04/2017
Linda-Jane Stopforth Chairperson 31/10/2007
Raymond John Yates Treasurer/Secretary 31/10/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Rosa Polaschek Trustee 31/07/2018
Fionna Sheppard Trustee 31/05/2018
Margaret Edwards Officer 1/06/2016
Helen Ruth Scott Committe Member 1/06/2014
Faith Evans Board Member 31/03/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
21/08/2014 NOC005
4/07/2013 NOC001
16/08/2011 AR004
24/09/2010 AR003

Charity Documents