pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Limapela Foundation
CC32616
9429043185313
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
September 30

Address for service

PO Box 67039
Mount Eden
Auckland
1349
29 Brixton Road
Mount Eden
Auckland
1024

Charity's other details

(09) 630 2460
(09) 630 2466

Africa

Zambia


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide high standards of practical education within poorer communities, including self reliance, honesty, compassion, justice & forgiveness. To foster school communities that are inclusive, supportive, self-sufficient and financially independent.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Education / training / research

Community development, Social services, Employment, Sport / recreation, Economic development, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Children / young people

General public, Families of students

Entity Structure

Up to 7 trustees who are responsible for oversight of this charity. Also provide advice and support for the work in Zambia.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 March 2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 March 2010.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2022 30/03/2022 $533,762 $256,241
31/03/2021 6/03/2021 $224,077 $196,989
31/03/2020 3/03/2021 $241,149 $239,446
31/03/2019 25/03/2019 $223,224 $217,966
31/03/2018 27/03/2018 $160,266 $188,756
31/03/2017 29/03/2017 $213,737 $201,249
31/03/2016 28/03/2016 $150,840 $165,659
31/03/2015 2/02/2015 $175,638 $132,002
31/03/2014 4/03/2014 $163,363 $202,485

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Gemma Clare Stewart Trustee 30/04/2021
Thomas Duxfield Trustee 30/04/2021
Donald Michael Cheesman Trustee 15/01/2016
Judy Lee Maguire Trustee 21/12/2011
Geoffrey Wiklund Chairman 3/11/2011
Matthew Frank Raymond Trustee 3/06/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Benjamin Karl O'Connor Trustee 28/02/2022
George Robert Bellingham trustee 30/09/2021
Gordon Stewart Trustee 1/09/2020
Terry Morris Webster Trustee 5/08/2011
Bryan Francis Ivamy trustee 27/07/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/02/2013 AR005
7/05/2012 NOC006
26/03/2012 AR004
24/11/2011 NOC005
24/11/2011 NOC004
31/03/2011 NOC003
18/03/2010 AR002
2/07/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents