pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Christchurch Photographic Society
CC39726
9429042612049
Registered

Registration details

3/05/2009
August 31

Address for service

95 Glandovey Road
Fendalton
Christchurch
8052
95 Glandovey Road
Po Box 1789
Fendalton
Christchurch
8052

Charity's other details

03 351 1987


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

CPS provides services to community members and the public through promotion of the enjoyment, mastery and advancement of the photographic science and art in all its applications and in particular by organising lectures, demonstrations and tuition in New Zealand. CPS encourages and facilitates friendship, co-operation and the exchange of information and ideas on photography amongst the members of the Society and elsewhere. CPS holds and promotes competitions, exhibitions and salons of photography.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Promotes frendship and participation in photography training, competitions and events)

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research, Photography Club

General public

Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Christchurch Photographic society operates cash accounts by annual membership fees and some charges for specific events on a cost recovery basis. Eg national competitions and field trips. Pecuniary gain is not a purpose of the Society and all income is returned to the Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
29/02/2020 - - - - To be filed
28/02/2019 5/12/2018 $32,504 $32,009
28/02/2018 4/12/2017 $14,460 $16,272
28/02/2017 28/02/2017 $14,335 $16,259
29/02/2016 15/01/2016 $14,027 $14,431
28/02/2015 21/01/2015 $19,053 $17,142
28/02/2014 21/01/2014 $19,762 $18,197
28/02/2013 14/03/2013 $18,446 $17,557
29/02/2012 25/01/2012 $18,905 $17,458
28/02/2011 16/01/2011 $19,511 $24,929

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Dawn Kirk Secretary 25/10/2017
Alan Moore Treasurer 29/10/2014
Paul Furborough president 30/10/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Nelson Boustead secretary 25/10/2017
Alistair Phillips Committee member 26/10/2016
Bruce Jensen President 26/10/2016
Ian Walls committee member 26/10/2016
Jo Curtis Committee member 26/10/2016
John Thornton Committee member 26/10/2016
Sebastien Krebs Committee 26/10/2016
Kelvin Aird Committee member 25/10/2016
Dave Slaten Committee Member 29/10/2014
Fernandez Barrett committee member 29/10/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/06/2019 NOC018
15/10/2018 NOC016
18/01/2016 NOC013
22/01/2015 NOC012
21/01/2014 NOC011
13/01/2013 NOC010
13/01/2012 NOC007
10/10/2011 NOC006
22/12/2010 NOC005
15/01/2010 NOC004

Charity Documents