Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Destiny International Trust
CC27985
9429043075348
Deregistered
15/02/2022
This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 41 of the Charities Act.

Below are details of Destiny International Trust at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

20/12/2017
March 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 15/02/2022 This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 41 of the Charities Act.
Registered 20/12/2017
De-registered 20/12/2017 This entity was removed from the Charities Register because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act.
Registered 30/06/2008

Address for service

PO Box 76433
Manukau City
Auckland
2241
25 Druces Road
Wiri
Auckland
2104

Charity's other details

095707150
095707149

Oceania

Australia


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our mission is to build a large great spirit-filled church that is both redemptive and creative in all its expressions, impacting the city of Auckland, New Zealand and the world for Jesus Christ.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

General public

Entity Structure

Destiny International Trust is a not-for-profit organisation governed by a board of trustees. The number of trustees may not be fewer than four. DIT is also the sole shareholder of Te Hahi o nga Matamua Holdings Ltd.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2021 31/12/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2020 31/12/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2019 31/03/2019 Member of 'Destiny International Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/09/2018 31/03/2018 Member of 'Destiny International Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/09/2017 31/03/2017 Member of 'Destiny International Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/09/2016 31/03/2016 Member of 'Destiny International Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 30/09/2015 $1,142,679 $1,307,940 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2014 30/09/2014 7/12/2014 $1,200,858 $1,242,621 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2013 30/09/2013 29/10/2014 $1,289,970 $1,307,821 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
28/02/2012 31/08/2012 31/01/2013 $426,357 $442,165 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Eden Lee O'Connor Trustee 1/04/2019
Marina Edna Tait Trustee 30/09/2014
David Lawrence Hohepa Kahu Trustee 26/06/2012
Talamasene Leiasamaivao Trustee 26/06/2012

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Hannah Radclavina Huirangi Tamaki Chairman 1/04/2019
Samuel Brian Francis Tamaki Trustee 30/09/2014
Richard Charles Lewis Elder 17/09/2013
Caine Daniel Warren Elder 25/06/2013
Tania Suzanne Pene Trustee 25/06/2013
Wayne Tione Kerei Pene Trustee 25/06/2013
Jean Pearl Hunt Trustee 26/06/2012
Peter Roy Hunt Trustee 26/06/2012
Janine Eleanor Cardno Trustee 8/06/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/05/2019 NOC015
6/10/2014 NOC010
17/12/2013 NOC009
10/07/2013 NOC005
26/03/2013 NOC004
25/02/2013 NOC003
26/10/2012 NOC002
31/08/2012 NOC001
24/03/2010 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.