Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Mangere Market Trust
CC40691
9429042755852
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Mangere Community Development & Cultural Trust 30/06/2008
The Mangere Market Trust 28/09/2011

Address for service

24 House Avenue
Mangere Bridge
Auckland
2022

Charity's other details

09 6365842


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Operates the Mangere Town Centre market and distribute grants to charitable, educational, sporting and community institutions in the Mangere area and support the Mangere Town Centre for benefit of the local community

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, General Public Schools

Community development

Education / training / research, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation

Children / young people

Voluntary bodies other than charities, General public, Migrants / refugees, Children Schools

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 14/07/2024 $436,598 $416,686 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 11/10/2023 $350,088 $323,227 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 30/09/2022 $165,706 $308,214 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 27/09/2021 $266,125 $416,021 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 30/09/2020 $443,885 $541,457 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 27/09/2019 $453,823 $367,631 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 27/09/2018 $444,830 $323,422 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 27/09/2017 $445,459 $325,666 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 29/09/2016 $440,040 $357,984 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Leatuao Larry Tupa'i-Lavea Trustee 24/07/2024
Jon Baulcomb Trustee 25/05/2022
Yvonne Thomas Trustee 27/04/2022
Ian Charles Russell Trustee 26/06/2019
David Glendinning Anstice Trustee 5/12/2018
Bill Alden Trustee 25/09/2013
Guy Manning Trustee 23/05/2012
Brian Laurence Pilkington Trustee 27/05/2009
Vinod Kumar Trustee 28/09/2007
Sylvia Rina Taylor Trustee 26/10/2005

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
David Ross Fearon Trustee 30/05/2024
Kenneth Charles Taylor Trustee 31/05/2022
Roy Graham Bagshaw Trustee 31/05/2022
Carole Shorrock Trustee 25/11/2020
Jon Baulcomb Trustee 26/06/2019
Ian Charles Russell Trustee 5/12/2018
Gavin Nell Trustee 25/09/2013
Thomas Doo Trustee 25/09/2013
Peter Judd Trustee 27/03/2013
Jitan Lal Trustee 23/05/2012
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/06/2022 NOC025
13/06/2022 NOC024
7/06/2022 NOC022
9/02/2021 NOC020
1/10/2020 NOC019
28/06/2019 NOC016
15/03/2019 NOC015
29/09/2014 NOC010
10/05/2013 NOC005
27/09/2012 AR005
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.