pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Arise Church
ARISE Church
CC30589
9429043126620
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 38228
Wellington Mail Centre
Petone
Lower Hutt
5045
3 Pito-One Road
Korokoro
Lower Hutt
5012

Charity's other details

04 499 0477
04 499 0478
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/ARISEchurchNZ


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

ARISE Church is about an amazing team of people inspired by their relationship with God, and wanting to make a difference in the lives of others - whether it be positive environments for children, engaging programmes for teenagers, opportunities for community engagement for young workers, marriage counselling for couples, parenting tips for families, hospital visitations, support for those grieving, life skills training, open homes, positive role models or in any one of a myriad of other ways.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Community development, Social services, Arts / culture / heritage, International activities, Economic development

Religious groups

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

The structure of the trust has change to the extent that the board now has the power to appoint new trustees, and that such power shall no longer rest with a single individual.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Arise Productions Limited (Non-Registered Entity) N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2021 29/06/2021 $12,969,889 $10,645,882
30/06/2020 29/06/2020 $13,782,405 $13,316,090
30/06/2019 27/06/2019 $13,314,246 $11,469,171
30/06/2018 30/06/2018 $11,742,712 $9,237,046
30/06/2017 30/06/2017 $5,836,156 $4,691,647
31/12/2016 21/12/2016 $10,618,753 $8,073,544
31/12/2015 22/12/2015 $8,176,082 $7,642,565
31/12/2014 22/12/2014 $7,953,058 $6,414,440
31/12/2013 24/12/2013 $6,972,216 $5,714,672

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Alice Louise Camaivuna Trustee 1/05/2022
Kylie Reenie Fletcher Trustee 15/04/2022
Robert William Reid Trustee 15/04/2022
Israel Faithful Cooper Trustee 17/02/2017
Graeme Robert Kirkwood Board Chairperson 16/12/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Brent Alan Cameron Trustee 12/04/2022
John Alan Cameron Trustee 12/04/2022
Andrew Simkin Trustee 25/11/2021
Dynes McConnell Trustee 18/02/2016
Neil Terrance Smith Trustee 16/12/2014
Gillian Margaret Cameron Trustee 1/09/2011
Paul De Jong Trustee 15/10/2009
Russell Evans Trustee 15/10/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/05/2022 NOC023
5/05/2022 NOC022
19/04/2022 NOC021
13/04/2022 NOC020
13/04/2022 NOC019
16/04/2018 NOC014
27/02/2017 NOC012
21/02/2017 NOC011
6/04/2016 NOC009
12/01/2015 NOC008

Charity Documents