Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Musical Theatre New Zealand Incorporated
CC27461
9429042771265
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

35 Glentui Lane
RD 12
Whatawhata
Hamilton
3293

Charity's other details

02102797798
https://www.facebook.com/MTNZI/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Vision Connecting communities creatively. Ko te Pūtaketanga Te huihuinga mai i ngā hapori wairua auaha. Mission One voice to educate, support and advocate; enriching all aspects of theatre in our community. Ko te huarahi Kia kotahi ai te whakaaro hei whakaora ai te iwi whare-tapere. Values Ngā Uaratanga: Commitment - to support our community with dedication and pride; valuing diversity. Me ngakau nui – Tautokohia tō tātou hapori, kia manaaki, kia tiaaki, kia whakapakari. Teamwork – stronger together – one voice, one goal. Me mahitahi – Kia kotahi ai te whakaaro. Integrity – safety, trust and respect. Me whakapono – Me mau ki te pono, te aroha, te manaaki. Belonging – an inclusive environment sharing a common passion. Me hono – hei āhurutanga te ngakau aroha.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, People with disabilities

Legal Structure

Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 22/05/2024 $158,671 $266,512 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 21/05/2023 $109,893 $92,092 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 2/04/2022 $123,140 $125,645 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 28/04/2021 $113,961 $97,831 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 30/03/2020 $180,253 $177,798 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 19/06/2019 $162,658 $178,047 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 18/06/2018 $164,020 $167,788 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 30/05/2017 $103,137 $90,870 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 7/05/2016 $118,640 $93,473 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Craig Rodgers Committee Member 15/03/2025
Matthew George Farnell NextGen Representative - Committee Member 15/03/2025
Emma Elizabeth Bishop President 16/03/2024
Mike Williams Committee Member 16/03/2024
Irene Edith Mosely Committee Member 11/03/2023
Elise Janine Rohde Treasurer 31/03/2022
Sonya Denise Aifai Committee Member 19/03/2022
Gavin Douglas Bailey Committee Member 16/03/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Helen Horsnell President 16/03/2024
Sharron Pardoe Vice President 31/03/2022
Daniel Leonard Pepperell President 21/03/2020
Katrina Michele Ghent General Manager 15/06/2019
Lesley Faye Carthew President 17/03/2018
Terence James O'Connor Vice President 19/03/2016
Ian Reid Vice President 22/03/2014
Lesley Reid Vice President 22/03/2014
John Antony President 21/03/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
10/03/2025 NOC023
22/05/2023 NOC019
30/06/2020 NOC016
31/03/2020 NOC014
19/06/2019 NOC012
29/04/2018 NOC010
29/04/2018 NOC009
7/05/2016 NOC007
23/11/2014 NOC006
25/06/2014 NOC005
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.