Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Empower International Trust
Empower Asia
CC25962
9429042942269
Registered

Registration details

16/06/2008
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Sure Destiny Trust 17/06/2008
Empower International Trust 23/06/2009

Address for service

PO Box 2334
South Dunedin
Dunedin
9044

Charity's other details

03-487-6114

North America

El Salvador, Honduras

Asia

Cambodia, India, Nepal, Thailand


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To empower local indigenous people to care for their own impoverished and at-risk youth via operating safe houses for children so that they may receive good all-round care and quality education.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Youth work), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Social services

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health

Children / young people

People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Entity Structure

The charity is run as a Trust with a governance board.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2023 31/10/2023 5/11/2023 $718,281 $763,164 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 31/01/2023 2/02/2023 $614,342 $614,871 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 31/01/2022 $718,603 $619,276 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 31/12/2020 21/12/2020 $653,963 $609,491 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 31/10/2019 29/10/2019 $417,210 $349,282 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 29/09/2018 $360,383 $373,138 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 28/09/2017 $459,727 $450,970 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 28/09/2016 $615,352 $576,535 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 27/09/2016 $409,556 $416,495 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2014 30/09/2014 23/09/2014 $457,881 $435,735 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Graham Wilson Trustee 27/03/2023
Paul Somerville Trustee 17/06/2008
Hamish Angus Crooks Trustee 1/07/2005
Carlie Somerville Trustee 25/02/1998

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Wilma Main Trustee 24/02/2022

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
12/06/2023 NOC018
1/04/2023 NOC017
30/03/2023 NOC015
16/08/2012 AR005
31/08/2011 AR004
18/10/2010 AR003
16/07/2010 NOC003
27/07/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.