Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Nga Whanau Ora
CC45633
9429043208951
Registered

Registration details

28/10/2010
March 31

Address for service

21 Wilson Crescent
Highbury
Palmerston North
4412

Charity's other details

027 305 3535


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To advance positive health outcomes, in particular, but not exclusively, to Maori Whanau. We accommodate various maori world views. This year we will offer social work and counselling services utilising maori methodology.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Provides religious services / activities

Social services

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Religious activities, Arts / culture / heritage, Economic development, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering, Non commercial Hearse and ambulance

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Religious groups

Entity Structure

We incorporate a chairperson, treasurer, supervisor and volunteers.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 16/10/2024 $25,109 $22,953 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 11/10/2023 $19,558 $17,116 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 31/10/2022 14/11/2022 $10,020 $14,218 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 19/10/2021 $12,763 $10,385 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/11/2020 21/01/2021 $1,950 $5,404 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 31/10/2019 21/10/2019 $8,516 $12,733 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/11/2018 28/10/2018 $31,112 $28,981 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 20/02/2018 $12,717 $15,328 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 4/10/2016 $54,465 $15,245 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Christine Ellen Macdonald Secretary 28/08/2010
James Ronnie Macdonald Chairperson 28/08/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/02/2012 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.