Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Sustainable Otautahi/Christchurch
CC20631
9429043056873
Registered

Registration details

24/01/2008
March 31

Address for service

41 Cuffs Road
Wainoni
Christchurch
8061

Charity's other details

(03)9818556
https://www.facebook.com/sustainablechristchurch


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Recognising Te Tiriti O Waitangi/The Treaty of Waitangi, to actively contribute within Otautahi/Christchurch to opportunities and means for achievement of long-term sustainability. In doing so, to seek to ensure that all people have their basic needs satisfied, so that they can live in dignity, in healthy communities, while having the minimum adverse impact on natural systems, now and in the future.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Education / training / research

Environment / conservation, Community development, Economic development, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Government

Entity Structure

The organisation is governed by an Executive Committee that manages the day-to-day operations of the organisation. The Executive Committee is elected by the members of the society at an Annual General Meeting.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 17/08/2024 $11,850 $11,792 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 31/10/2023 $10,885 $6,622 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 6/09/2022 $12,619 $14,204 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 21/09/2021 $11,755 $17,076 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 27/09/2020 $21,548 $9,548 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 29/08/2019 $12,740 $9,330 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 28/05/2018 $310 $175 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 22/08/2017 $815 $865 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 24/08/2016 $7,958 $10,705 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Benjamin D Jassin Executive member 27/06/2024
David Clendon Guthrey Vice-Chairperson 27/06/2024
Joyce Ann Yager Executive member 27/06/2024
Katrina Rachel Miller Secretary 27/06/2024
Philip William Pearson Executive member 27/06/2024
Sarah Jane Hendry Executive member 27/06/2024
Thi Toan Pham Treasurer 27/06/2024
Colleen Philip Chairperson 28/06/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Ashley Jane Campbell Executive member 13/09/2024
David John Evans Treasurer 27/06/2024
Joyce Yager Chairperson 31/08/2023
Anthea Madill Secretary 2/06/2022
David Guthrey Vice-Chairperson 2/06/2022
Rosemary Neave Secretary 20/06/2019
Nelson John Peet Chairperson 28/06/2018
Lorraine Leonard - 20/06/2016
Marney Ainsworth Chairperson 20/06/2016
Lorraine Isabelle Leonard Treasurer 11/09/2015
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
28/11/2024 NOC019
21/08/2024 NOC018
15/08/2019 NOC011
14/08/2019 NOC010
11/09/2015 NOC006
27/08/2013 AR007
28/09/2010 AR004

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.