Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Maa Shakti Charitable Trust
Maa Durga Temple
CC46091
9429043216000
Registered

Registration details

27/01/2011
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 217064
Botany Junction
Flat Bush
Auckland
2164
3 Onslow Avenue
3 Onslow Road
Papatoetoe
Auckland
2104

Charity's other details

021 022 17292
https://www.facebook.com/Maa-Durga-Temple-Auckland-141868609345266/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purpose and objects of the Trust is to facilitate, social and religious activities that enhance quality of life of the people of New Zealand. Maa Shakti Charitable Trust also helps new migrants from overseas in settling in New Zealand and educate people for a drug and violence free society.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Social services, Arts / culture / heritage, Promotion of volunteering

People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Entity Structure

Maa Shakti Chartitable Trust is a non-profit organisation established by a trust deed dated 03/11/2010 and subject to the Charities Act 2005. It currently has three trustees who are responsible for the overall governing of this entity.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2011 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2012.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 25/07/2024 $170,800 $185,581 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 11/09/2023 $150,601 $144,838 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 24/08/2022 $99,127 $99,896 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 25/08/2021 $168,278 $169,055 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 3/08/2020 $161,452 $153,989 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 5/09/2019 $126,448 $121,800 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 28/08/2018 $181,976 $168,838 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 20/10/2017 $118,983 $127,746 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 12/09/2016 $136,634 $121,529 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Dinesh Kumar Sharma Trustee 1/04/2019
Sunita Murti Trustee 1/04/2016
Sarika Gulati Trustee 1/01/2012
Vijay Gulati Trustee 19/10/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Ritesh Chandra Trustee 31/03/2014
Sunita Murti Trustee 1/04/2013
Sukhvinder Singh Trustee 31/12/2011
Vinay Mehta Trustee 31/12/2011
Vishal Rikhi Trustee 31/12/2011
Subhash Rikhi Trustee 31/10/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/07/2022 NOC014
28/04/2019 NOC009
1/03/2017 NOC006
14/09/2016 NOC005
1/02/2016 NOC003
25/08/2012 AR001
16/03/2012 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.