Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Destiny Television Ministries International Trust
CC28102
9429042965909
Deregistered
22/05/2012
This entity was removed from the Charities Register because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act.

Below are details of Destiny Television Ministries International Trust at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Registration history

Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 22/05/2012 This entity was removed from the Charities Register because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act.
Registered 30/06/2008

Address for service

PO Box 51761
Pakuranga
Auckland
2140
18 Allright Place
Mount Wellington
Auckland
1060

Charity's other details

095707150
095707149


Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Community development, Social services, Employment, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, International activities, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Religious groups

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2012 30/09/2012 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2011 30/09/2011 - - - To be filed To be filed
28/02/2010 31/08/2010 16/02/2011 $382,440 $409,798 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
28/02/2009 31/08/2009 10/05/2010 $343,445 $569,716 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Samuel Brian Francis Tamaki Trustee 1/03/2007
Hannah Radclavina Huirangi Tamaki Chairman 7/04/2000
Jean Pearl Hunt Trustee 7/04/2000
Michael Selwyn Draper Trustee 7/04/2000
Peter Roy Hunt Trustee 7/04/2000

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
10/05/2010 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.