pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Ecopeople Limited
CC41147
9429036479467
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 307
Waikato Mail Centre
Hamilton
3240
293 Grey Street
Hamilton East
Hamilton
3216

Charity's other details

07 857 1200
07 857 1296


Group Members


Below are all the members of Wise Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Blueprint NZ Limited
Blueprint Trust Board
Ecopeople Limited
Linkage Limited
LinkPeople Limited
Mental Health Solutions Limited
Pacific Inc. Limited
Pathways Health Limited
Pathways Trust Board
Wise Trust Board

Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Creates Employment through the development of Social Enterprise businesses)

Health

Employment

Other (please state)

(People with Mental Illness)


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2021 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2020 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2019 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2018 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2017 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2016 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2015 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2014 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2013 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2012 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jacqueline Mary Graham Director 6/06/2002
Julie Joy Nelson Director 6/06/2002
Michael David Ward Director 6/06/2002

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
24/06/2021 NOC003
10/08/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents