pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Wellington Diving Club Incorporated
WDC, Wellington Diving
CC54064
9429042837688
Registered

Registration details

24/11/2016
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 14781
Kilbirnie
Wellington
6241
C/O Wellington Regional Aquatic Centre
63 Kilbirnie Crescent
Kilbirnie
Wellington
6022

Charity's other details

Facebook icon image
www.facebook.com/WellingtonDivingClub
www.instagram.com/wellingtondivingclub


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Wellington Diving Club is a thriving, nurturing and challenging community of divers, coaches, judges, administrators and sponsors, responsible for the safety and well-being of recreational, competitive and high-performance athletes.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Sport / recreation

General public

Entity Structure

The Club is run by a committee of three Executive Officers (President, Secretary and Treasurer) and other officers who have specific roles. We are affiliated to Diving New Zealand (a Registered Charity), the national diving body.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2021 30/04/2021 $167,255 $144,811
30/06/2020 4/05/2020 $224,640 $182,239
30/06/2019 3/05/2019 $160,629 $174,269
30/06/2018 26/05/2018 $135,408 $158,304
30/09/2017 28/09/2017 $150,727 $130,318

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Gayle Tristram President 25/03/2021
Eva Brinck Secretary 11/03/2020
Richard Greenwood Treasurer 11/03/2020

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Mona Jeffreys President 25/03/2021
James Beard Treasurer 11/03/2020
Susan Smith Secretary 11/03/2020
Richard Greenwood President 20/03/2019
Gayle Tristram Secretary 10/04/2018
Maria Marull President 13/05/2017
Phoebe Wu Treasurer 13/05/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/04/2021 NOC012
3/05/2020 NOC009
3/05/2019 NOC007
3/05/2019 NOC006
21/05/2018 NOC003
29/09/2017 NOC002

Charity Documents