Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Wellington Fire Service Support Unit
Wellington Operational Support
CC28959
N/A
Registered

Registration details

6/30/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 14139
Kilbirnie
Wellington
6241
7 Troy Street
1 Troy Street
Kilbirnie
Wellington
6022

Charity's other details

www.facebook.com/WellingtonFireSupport


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Wellington Fire Service Support Unit is a dedicated team of volunteers supporting Fire and Emergency New Zealand and our community, when they need it most, through specialised skills, techniques, and equipment.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Emergency / disaster relief

Education / training / research, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Entity Structure

The the assigned General Manager, Fire and Emergency New Zealand, acting as Wellington Fire Service Support Unit's Chief Fire Officer, appoints the Officer in Charge. The Officer in Charge acts as the Chair of the Management Committee and appoints the committee's Deputy, Secretary, and Treasurer. A Fire Fighter's Representative is elected annually by member Fire Fighters and is also appointed to the Management Committee.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
3/31/2024 9/30/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
3/31/2023 9/30/2023 10/4/2023 $11,575 $11,109 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2022 9/30/2022 6/19/2022 $10,443 $7,993 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2021 9/30/2021 9/27/2021 $7,947 $8,826 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
6/30/2020 12/31/2020 12/13/2020 $11,668 $10,470 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
6/30/2019 12/31/2019 12/11/2019 $16,177 $15,316 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
6/30/2018 12/31/2018 12/19/2018 $13,449 $7,412 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
6/30/2017 2/28/2018 2/14/2018 $11,336 $6,378 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
6/30/2016 12/31/2016 4/18/2017 $9,987 $5,837 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
6/30/2015 12/31/2015 2/4/2016 $9,955 $5,914 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination
= Balance Date Change
- This Annual Return will cover 9 months from 1 July 2020 to 31 March 2021.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Stephen John Lambert Treasurer 9/25/2023
Johnathan Steven Ashman Station Officer (SO) 10/17/2016
Philip Julian Harris Second in Command (SO) 10/15/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Catherine F Coe Secretary 9/25/2023
Todd Malcolm Skilton Treasurer 6/13/2022
Colin George Larsen Secretary 9/20/2021
Mark Stuart Foster Station Officer, Secretary 2/15/2021
Norman John Patrick Kelly Station Officer Treasurer 11/6/2020
Brian Maxwell Arons Officer in Charge (SSO) 10/17/2016
Sandy Graeme Lawson Secretary 3/1/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
9/26/2021 NOC015
3/8/2021 NOC014
3/8/2021 NOC013
2/27/2018 NOC009
1/20/2017 NOC006
12/6/2012 AR005
4/21/2011 AR003
8/5/2009 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.