Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Zealand Open Source Society Incorporated
The New Zealand Open Source Society, NZOSS
CC42367
9429043000395
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

78 Campbell Street
Karori
Wellington
6012

Charity's other details

021460594
@nzoss


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our mission (and our purpose) is to share the freedom of open source software, open standards, and open information for the benefit of New Zealand. We do that through education, community building, and advocacy.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Our purpose is to share the freedom of open source software, open standards, and open information for the benefit of New Zealand. We do that through education, community building, and advocacy.), Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Community development

Education / training / research, Employment, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering, Preservation of basic liberties and ability to share

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

We are a national Incorporated Society, with a Council, supported by a membership. The Council includes an Executive - a President and Vice President. We, as required, have Regional Coordinators, Regional Committees, Standing Committees, Special Purpose Committees and a National Secretariat.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 7/11/2022 $1,845 $211 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 7/11/2022 $701 $117 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 9/11/2020 $429 $69 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 8/11/2020 $680 $5,351 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 14/11/2018 $2,819 $414 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 30/09/2017 $986 $1,464 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 31/12/2016 $1,175 $4,097 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 25/01/2016 $1,137 $4,593 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2014 30/09/2014 25/01/2016 $4,772 $7,370 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Carl Klitscher Secretary/Treasurer 7/11/2017
Danny William Adair Councillor 18/09/2015
David Lane Councillor 18/09/2015
Steven Ellis Councillor 18/09/2015
Tim McNamara President 18/09/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Aimee Whitcroft Council Member 31/03/2019
Rob Elshire Councillor 8/08/2018
Daniel Reurich Treasurer 7/11/2017
Birgit Bachler Councillor 22/10/2016
Brent Wood Education Officer 22/10/2016
Daniel Reurich Committee Member 22/10/2016
David Lane Committee Member 22/10/2016
Jaco Van der Merwe Council member 22/10/2016
Marek Kuziel Councillor 22/10/2016
Matthew Holloway Committee Member 22/10/2016
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/11/2018 NOC013
19/12/2016 NOC010
27/01/2016 NOC009
27/01/2016 NOC008
27/01/2016 NOC007
23/10/2015 NOC006
21/02/2014 NOC005
19/10/2012 AR005
5/05/2012 AR004
26/09/2010 AR003

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.