pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Colville Junction Charitable Trust
CSSC
CC20405
9429042956068
Registered

Registration details

7/01/2008
March 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Colville Social Service Collective Charitable Trust 8/01/2008
Colville Junction Charitable Trust 15/01/2022

Address for service

C/o Postal Delivery Centre
Colville
3547
2311 Colville Road
RD4
Coromandel
3584

Charity's other details

(07) 866 6920
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/Colville-Social-Service-Collective-2034510883241770/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Vision: The remote communities of the northern Coromandel Peninsula are strong and vibrant. Mission: To strengthen and build connections, capacity and well-being with our communities. Our goals: 1: To enable and support a range of services and community led development opportunities 2: Ensure our trust is financially sustainable for the long-term benefit of our communities. 3: Facilitate training, workforce development and other opportunities to strengthen our local communities and organisations, including CSSC Board & staff. 4: i) Develop and maintain strategic relationships and networks to achieve positive outcomes for our communities. 
 ii) Form relationships with hapū and whānau in recognition of their mana whenua status. 
 5: To be a partner in the development and implementation of the project as outlined in the current MOU. 6. Develop and deliver a communication plan that engages key stakeholders, raises our profile and promotes access to our services.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Youth and Activities

Social services

Education / training / research, Community development, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, General public

Entity Structure

The Colville Junction Trust Board is the legal authority for the organisation. The organisation changed its name in January 2021 from Colville Social Service Collective. The Trustees represent the interests of the Trust's beneficiaries. The role of the Trustees is governance, which includes strategic direction and self-review, policy, risk management and annual performance. The Trust Board is run in accordance with the Trust Deed and relevant legislation.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 30/08/2022 $451,198 $391,804
31/10/2021 29/10/2021 $205,433 $197,867
30/09/2020 23/09/2020 $256,307 $255,152
30/09/2019 20/09/2019 $278,504 $270,681
30/09/2018 26/09/2018 $298,605 $263,325
30/09/2017 12/09/2017 $179,942 $176,339
30/09/2016 27/09/2016 $169,462 $128,259
30/09/2015 4/09/2015 $88,981 $72,003
30/09/2014 22/08/2014 $65,655 $63,085
30/09/2013 30/10/2013 $60,060 $61,887

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Frederick Church Trustee 1/08/2016
Bronwyn Blair Trustee 14/05/2013
Janet Palmer Trustee 15/05/2012

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Katherine Jane Shelley Trustee 27/03/2020
Joanna Christine Pearsall Trustee 21/07/2019
Colleen Tiller Trustee 9/08/2017
Julie Noname Trustee 23/08/2016
Janet Powell Treasurer 18/03/2014
Lora Mountjoy trustee 19/02/2014
Hannah White secretary 11/06/2013
Jane Mcalister Treasurer 11/12/2012
Brenda Carson Trustee / Chair 21/08/2012
Katherine Shelley trustee 23/08/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/01/2022 NOC024
24/08/2020 NOC021
3/09/2019 NOC019
30/05/2019 NOC018
18/06/2018 NOC016
18/06/2018 NOC015
18/06/2018 NOC014
27/05/2018 NOC013
5/11/2016 NOC011
25/07/2016 NOC009

Charity Documents