pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Zealand Land Search and Rescue Training Limited
CC56736
9429047156500
Registered

Registration details

27/03/2019
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 13182
Armagh
Phillipstown
Christchurch
8141
35 Sir William Pickering Drive
Burnside
Christchurch
8053

Charity's other details



Group Members


Below are all the members of New Zealand Land Search and Rescue Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
New Zealand Land Search and Rescue Incorporated
New Zealand Land Search and Rescue Training Limited
Search and Rescue Institute New Zealand (SARINZ) Limited

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The charitable purpose of New Zealand Land Search and Rescue Training Limited is to promote and advance the education of the public of New Zealand in matters related to search and rescue and to provide education, training and assessment for the purposes of developing and retaining an internationally credible, effective and efficient search and rescue capability throughout New Zealand at a standard equal to or better than international best practice.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research

Emergency / disaster relief

Education / training / research

General public

Other charities

Entity Structure

New Zealand Land Search and Rescue Training Limited is a wholly owned subsidiary of New Zealand Land Search and Rescue Incorporated. The Company comprises a Board of five directors who oversee the governance of the Company.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2022 Member of 'New Zealand Land Search and Rescue Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2021 Member of 'New Zealand Land Search and Rescue Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2020 Member of 'New Zealand Land Search and Rescue Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2019 Member of 'New Zealand Land Search and Rescue Group' group - click here to view Annual Return

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Megan Kate Dimozantos Director 16/11/2021
Charlotte Aronsen Director 10/10/2020
Julian Tovey Director 10/10/2020
Camilla Clare Mary Owen Board member 19/10/2019
Craig John Wells Board member 19/10/2019
Wayne David Stevens Board member 19/10/2019
Graham Mark Pomeroy Director 30/11/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Iain Campbell Watson Director 30/10/2021
David James Robertson Director 10/10/2020
Roger Terry Blumhardt Director 10/10/2020
David Howard Erson Director 19/10/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/11/2021 NOC006
31/07/2020 NOC003

Charity Documents