pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Institute of Advanced Motorists New Zealand Incorporated
IAM Roadsmart
CC47565
9429042620594
Registered

Registration details

21/08/2011
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 222
Waikanae
5250
121 Tui Way
Putaruru 3411
Raumati Beach
Paraparaumu
5032

Charity's other details

0272830603
n/a


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

IAM NZ is a charitable organisation dedicated to promoting better driving and riding and enhancing road safety, by taking the standard of driving and riding of existing drivers and riders to a level significantly higher than that required to pass the normal driving test.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Driver Education), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Education / training / research

Driver Education

General public

Entity Structure

(a) The control and management of the affairs of the Institute shall be in the hands of the Council which shall be elected at the Annual General Meeting and which shall be comprised of the President, the Vice-President, National Secretary, National Treasurer (or National Secretary/Treasurer), and two to six general members.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2022 17/03/2022 $20,757 $16,484
30/06/2021 26/06/2021 $18,708 $9,369
30/06/2020 16/08/2020 $16,076 $14,620
30/06/2019 8/06/2019 $18,348 $14,308
31/12/2017 8/06/2019 $17,604 $19,548
31/12/2016 2/01/2017 $15,449 $13,392
31/12/2015 19/11/2015 $5,741 $6,228
30/09/2014 23/09/2014 $6,355 $6,186
30/09/2013 15/09/2013 $8,430 $7,267
30/09/2012 26/09/2012 $4,940 $4,143

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Barry Holland Council Member 5/02/2022
Carey Griffiths Chief Examiner (motorcycles) 5/02/2022
Christopher John Best Ex-officio Council member 5/02/2022
Heather Kinsey National Secretary 5/02/2022
Mark Leslie Ex-officio Council member 5/02/2022
Mark Revill-Johnson Chief Examiner (cars) 5/02/2022
Paul Buttell Council member 5/02/2022
Paul Nees President 5/02/2022
Wendy Betteridge Council Member 20/02/2021
Mike Turner Director of Tests 22/02/2020

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Colin Gates Council member 5/02/2022
Joanne Mitchell Council Officer 5/02/2022
Tessa Robins National Secretary 5/02/2022
Bruce Everett Council Member 8/11/2021
Graeme Bergh Chief Examiner, Motorcycle Division 8/11/2021
Tony Knight President; Ex officio Council member - CNI Regional Chair 8/11/2021
Ben Payne Vice President; Ex-Officio Council member - Regional Chair - Auckland 2/11/2021
Neil Stodart Council member 2/09/2021
Carey Griffiths President 30/07/2021
Peter Hookham Vice President and Regional Chair, Wellington 30/07/2021

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
17/03/2022 NOC017
3/03/2022 NOC016
12/09/2021 NOC015
25/03/2018 NOC010
21/11/2017 NOC009
22/09/2015 NOC007
13/02/2015 NOC006
13/02/2015 NOC005
23/09/2014 NOC004
15/09/2013 NOC001

Charity Documents