Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Destiny Church Tauranga Trust
CC27986
9429042963417
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
February 28

Address for service

PO Box 13351
Tauranga Central
Tauranga
3141
749 Welcome Bay Road
RD 5
Waitao
Tauranga
3175

Charity's other details

075792974
https://www.facebook.com/Destinychurchtauranga/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide our church and neighbouring communities with free services and programs that offer holistic solutions and ongoing mentoring to strengthen individuals and families, ultimately creating healthier communities.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, Employment, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Economic development, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

Religious groups

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

Destiny Church Tauranga consists of four Trustees, two of which are employed by the organisation: 1 part-time administrator/Pastor - 25 hours per week 1 full-time pastors/lead coordinator for programs & services/graphics/planning/advertising - 40 hours per week

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
28/02/2024 31/08/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
28/02/2023 31/08/2023 30/10/2023 $284,648 $229,202 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
28/02/2022 31/08/2022 1/09/2022 $243,692 $233,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
28/02/2021 31/08/2021 16/05/2022 $178,732 $163,212 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
28/02/2020 31/10/2020 31/10/2020 $148,138 $150,451 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
28/02/2019 31/08/2019 30/08/2019 $163,209 $155,518 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
28/02/2018 31/08/2018 31/08/2018 $146,779 $142,248 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
28/02/2017 31/08/2017 31/08/2017 $141,620 $132,266 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
28/02/2016 31/08/2016 27/08/2016 $96,960 $95,975 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
28/02/2015 31/08/2015 27/08/2015 $103,210 $105,508 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Eden Lee O'Connor Trustee 1/04/2019
Peni Hillman Trustee 11/10/2017
Lynda Mary Merepeka Samuels Trustee 26/08/2012
Leon Samuels Trustee 1/03/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Simon Blake Trustee 11/08/2021
Hannah Radclavina Huirangi Tamaki Chairman 1/04/2019
Matetahatika Samuels Trustee 9/10/2017
Kereti Simmonds Trustee 27/09/2017
Greg Nock Trustee 28/11/2012
Kim Nock Trustee 28/11/2012
Blair Arrowsmith Trustee 26/08/2012
Roberta Ann Maxwell Trustee 1/08/2012
Campbell Lloyd Harvey Trustee 3/01/2009
Damien James Connor Trustee 6/03/2008
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/09/2021 NOC014
22/05/2019 NOC011
12/06/2013 NOC005
29/11/2012 NOC004
31/08/2012 AR005
10/09/2010 NOC003
30/08/2010 NOC002
30/08/2010 AR003

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.