Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Mauri Ora Kakapo Trust
CC57093
9429047567856
Registered

Registration details

17/07/2019
June 30

Address for service

15 Show Place
Addington
Christchurch
8024
C/- Te Runanga o Ngai Tahu
PO Box 13046
Armagh
Christchurch
8141

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The protection, preservation, rejuvenation, regeneration and sustenance of Kakapo within Aotearoa/New Zealand and/or any all matters fairly and reasonably connected to such, including relevant marketing, promotions and public information campaigns, scientific research, predator control and habitat restoration or enhancement.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Care / protection of animals

Environment / conservation

Animals

Entity Structure

The structure is a Charitable Trust board under the Charitable Trusts Act 1957.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 19/12/2023 $573,103 $123,148 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 16/01/2023 $247,386 $550,358 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 26/11/2021 $701,187 $88,257 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 21/07/2020 $188,076 $158,006 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Estelle Pura Leask Trustee 12/07/2019
Tane Craig Davis Trustee 12/07/2019

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.