pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Kuaotunu Bird Rescue Trust
CC57087
N/A
Registered

Registration details

11/09/2019
March 31

Address for service

114 Kuaotunu Wharekaho Road
RD 2
Kuaotunu
Whitianga
3592

Charity's other details

0276 006959
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/Kuaotunu-Bird-Rescue-1469420776711117/?ref=bookmarks


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide care and rehabilitate sick, injured and orphaned birds to enable them to be successfully released back into the wild

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Care / protection of animals

Animals

Entity Structure

We are a Charitable Trust with a base in Kuaotunu We have two trustees

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 20/09/2022 $24,947 $18,549
30/09/2021 7/09/2021 $15,589 $13,982
30/09/2020 22/09/2020 $7,741 $6,136

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Ben Kregting Trustees 11/09/2019
Annemieke Kregting Trustee 5/06/2019

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents