pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Edmund Rice Justice Aotearoa/New Zealand Trust
Edmund Rice Justice
CC21058
9429043177561
Registered

Registration details

11/02/2008
December 31

Address for service

34 Queen Mary Avenue
Epsom
Auckland
1023

Charity's other details

027 610 9956


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Edmund Rice Justice Aotearoa New Zealand is committed to working for Social Justice. Through out commitment to building right relationship and community we aim to live out our Gospel Values in the inspiration of Edmund Rice’s story.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Provides religious services / activities

Education / training / research

Community development, Social services, Religious activities, International activities, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups, Criminals & Victims of Crime

Entity Structure

Edmund Rice Justice Trust is a charitable trust that is currently owned by 6 trustees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2022 27/07/2022 $45,035 $42,957
30/06/2021 14/09/2021 $24,092 $32,782
30/06/2020 21/08/2020 $62,661 $56,600
30/06/2019 1/08/2019 $69,419 $60,090
30/06/2018 1/07/2018 $71,752 $45,290
30/06/2017 5/08/2017 $70,185 $65,464
30/06/2016 18/07/2016 $69,584 $54,617
30/06/2015 20/08/2015 $30,098 $78,602
30/06/2014 20/08/2015 $92,119 $73,800

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Sam Wojcik Trustee 13/02/2021
Bernie Lee Trustee 13/02/2020
Megan Yardley Trustee - Deputy Chairperson 13/02/2020
Catherine Maree Harrison Trustee 14/06/2015
Paul Malcolm Robertson Trustee Chairperson 16/12/2012
Kieran Fouhy Trustee - Treasurer 12/02/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Boris Anthony Baptist Treasurer 1/07/2022
Martin Thompson Taylor Trustee Deputy Chairperson 22/08/2021
Samuel James Drumm Trustee 19/05/2019
Deborah Marie Frank Trustee Secretary 17/02/2019
Owen Doody Trustee Treasurer 31/12/2017
Christine O'brien Trustee 30/04/2015
David Douglas Ivory Trustee 30/04/2015
Paul O'neill Trustee 30/04/2015
Mary Kayes N/A 1/01/2014
Damaris Lyn Kingdon N/A 6/08/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/08/2017 NOC014
19/07/2016 NOC012
26/04/2016 NOC011
10/03/2014 NOC010
16/06/2011 NOC007
25/03/2011 NOC006
13/10/2010 AR003
6/08/2010 NOC005
20/05/2010 NOC004
26/05/2009 AR002

Charity Documents