Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Palmerston North Heritage Trust
CC32611
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

Private Bag 11034
Manawatu Mail Centre
Palmerston North
4442
32 The Square
Palmerston North 4410
Palmerston North
4410

Charity's other details

(06) 356 8199


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To encourage public awareness of and preserve material to do with the history of Palmerston North and the surrounding region.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Collection, preservation and display of archival material of relevance to Palmerston North and its surrounding region)

Arts / culture / heritage

General public

Entity Structure

The Palmerston North City Council is the trustee and the Trust is administered by staff of the Council. Day to day Trust activity is overseen by an administering committee appointed by the Council.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 19/12/2024 $4,959 $3,163 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 6/12/2023 $3,496 $3,451 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 4/11/2022 $3,519 $6,629 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 20/01/2022 $6,124 $5,973 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 27/10/2020 $10,637 $9,961 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 15/10/2019 $13,111 $13,185 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 10/12/2018 $16,704 $15,378 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 8/09/2017 $8,545 $8,402 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 23/12/2016 $2,717 $2,812 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 24/11/2015 $4,454 $3,523 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Palmerston North City Council Body Corporate 1/09/1997

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/01/2017 NOC006
6/12/2012 AR005
20/12/2010 AR003

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.