Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Special Olympics Lower North Island (LNI) Trust
CC42299
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Special Olympics Lower North Island Regional Council 30/06/2008
Special Olympics Lower North Island (LNI) Trust 9/12/2022

Address for service

PO Box 38344
Wellington Mail Centre
Lower Hutt
5045

Charity's other details

0211912667


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

We provide quality year-round training and competition in a variety of sports for all children and adults with an intellectual disability, giving those athletes opportunities to develop physical fitness, demonstrate courage and participate in sharing life skills and friendships with their families, other athletes and the community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Run Sports Training and Competitions

People with disabilities

Sport / recreation, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering, Sports Activities for People with Intellectual Disabilities

People with disabilities

Children / young people, General public, People with Intellectual Disabilities

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 24/05/2024 $102,779 $92,075 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 2/05/2023 $34,206 $33,836 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 23/06/2022 $32,782 $31,718 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 31/07/2021 8/07/2021 $38,469 $45,274 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/09/2020 18/05/2021 $85,554 $86,638 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 21/06/2019 $28,301 $30,909 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 25/06/2018 $23,202 $25,507 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 21/05/2017 $52,527 $55,231 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 12/05/2016 $52,683 $52,871 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Neil Alexander Blake Trustee 6/06/2024
Ryan Smith Trustee 3/05/2023
Margaret Carley Treasurer 27/04/2023
Shani Kowalczyk Trustee 27/04/2023
Logan Amer Committee Member 21/04/2022
Bruce Neal Trustee 21/04/2021
Cheryl Burden Committee Member 21/04/2021
Mike Ryan Trustee 21/04/2021
Paula Dixon Committee Member 21/04/2021
Anne Cheetham Chairperson and Trustee 6/05/2019
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Allan Smith Committee Member 21/04/2022
Margaret Mary Baker Committee Member 21/04/2022
Marilyn Morrison Committee Member 21/04/2022
Paul Sullivan Treasurer 21/04/2022
David Netherton Burrowes Committee Member 21/04/2021
John Dunweg Committee Member 21/04/2021
Matthew Burgess Chairperson 21/04/2021
Vivian Easton Committee Member 21/04/2021
John Smailes Committee Member 19/04/2020
Christine Margaret Richardson Chairperson 6/05/2019
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/07/2024 NOC025
24/05/2024 NOC022
3/05/2023 NOC021
9/12/2022 NOC019
8/12/2022 NOC018
1/06/2016 NOC011
20/05/2016 NOC010
7/08/2015 NOC009
17/06/2014 NOC008
5/06/2014 NOC007
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


Notices

This entity was removed from a single entity group (CC42351) on 9 December 2022.

load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.