pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


MOUNT HIWI CHARITABLE TRUST
CC58565
N/A
Registered

Registration details

6/11/2020
March 31

Address for service

19 Jocelyn Crescent
Pinehaven
Upper Hutt
5019
0 Braemore Road
Waverley
4544

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

preserve and regenerate indigenous NZ Ecosystems in perpetuity foster initiatives that minimise negative impacts on regenerating ecosystems foster the use of toxic free technologies for flora and fauna pest control establish and maintain a native wildlife sanctuary on the Mount Hiwi Property provide facilities for research, education and community involvement in the preservation and regeneration of indigenous NZ ecosystems any other act within NZ that advances the above charitable objectives.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Environment / conservation

General public

Entity Structure

We administer land based in the Taranaki area. We currently have six Trustees that constitute our governance board, including three executive positions: chair, treasurer and secretary.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return for the year ended 31 March 2021 under section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2021 - - - - Exempt

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Philip Cleaver Trustee 23/11/2020
Delia Rose Small Secretary 18/09/2018
Michelle Bird Trustee 23/11/2017
Suzanne Blackburn Trustee 23/11/2017
Philip John Hancock Chair 5/04/2016
Richard William Lucy Treasurer 5/04/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/01/2021 NOC001

Charity Documents