pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Celtic Supporters of the Doyle Academy of Irish Dance Incorporated
CESDAIDI
CC41920
9429043034574
Registered

Registration details

26/08/2009
December 31

Address for service

2 Andrew Road
Howick
Auckland
2010

Charity's other details

0212963945


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promote and support the activities of the Doyle Academy of Irish Dancing. In particilur the sociaty is fundrasing to assist dancers and dance teachers in the society to attend and participate in National and International Festivals, Concerts, Competitions and workshops and with the provision of the school uniforms and costumes for use by the dancers, supporters and by the schools teacher(s) in the society.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Arts / culture / heritage

Sport / recreation

Children / young people

Older people, General public

Entity Structure

The Executive Committee comprises of the following members; Chairperson, Secretary, Treasurer and no less than one other member and no more than five other members of the Society. The principal of the school and the senior dance teacher of the school. The financial year of the society is from 1 April to 31 March of each year.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2022 24/02/2022 $5,300 $15,722
30/06/2021 19/07/2021 $21,641 $6,912
30/06/2020 29/06/2020 $18,024 $15,571
30/09/2019 12/12/2019 $24,768 $16,983
30/09/2018 9/11/2018 $21,542 $10,547
30/09/2017 4/07/2017 $41,057 $22,072
30/09/2016 25/07/2016 $21,558 $16,900
30/09/2015 22/07/2015 $26,515 $26,411
30/09/2014 15/08/2014 $28,069 $30,709
30/09/2013 5/03/2014 $28,094 $23,338
= Balance Date Change
- This annual return will cover the period 1 April 2019- 31 December 2019 (9 months) due to a balance date change.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Gloria Piano Secretary 20/02/2021
Helen Jennings Chair 20/02/2021
Sarah Hazel General Member 20/02/2021
Brooke Lunevich Costume manager 5/12/2020
Rita Hoy Kitchen Manager 7/12/2019
Angela Ledgerwood General Member 29/07/2018
Paula Josephine Hunkin Teacher 24/07/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jackie O'Hara Treasurer 1/12/2021
Nuch Wadell Kitchen Manager 20/02/2021
Mariana Boteva Costume Secretary 2/12/2019
Kim Segedin General Member 4/11/2019
Edwine White Secretary 29/07/2018
Michele Bartlet Costume Secretary 29/07/2018
Peter Gibson Chair 29/07/2018
Sharon Rose Walshe Grant Application Officer 29/07/2018
Vanessa Galloway General member 29/07/2018
Nicola Roy Chair Person 31/07/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/08/2021 NOC015
29/08/2021 NOC014
15/10/2019 NOC010
19/08/2014 NOC005
21/08/2012 AR004
19/07/2011 NOC002

Charity Documents