pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Cure Our Ovarian Cancer (Low Grade Serous) Charitable Trust
Cure Our Ovarian Cancer, Ovarian Cancer NZ
CC55925
9429046845467
Registered

Registration details

31/07/2018
March 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Cure My Ovarian Cancer (Low Grade Serous) Charitable Trust 14/11/2018
Cure Our Ovarian Cancer (Low Grade Serous) Charitable Trust 5/12/2018

Address for service

PO Box 143
Dunedin Central
Dunedin
9054
Gallaway Cook Allan
Level 2, 123 Vogel Street
Dunedin Central
Dunedin
9016

Charity's other details

Facebook icon image
facebook.com/ovariancancernz
Twitter icon image
twitter.com/cure_ovarian_ca
facebook.com/cureourovariancancer

Oceania

Australia

North America

Canada, United States

Europe

United Kingdom


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

- Improve the standard of care received by women with ovarian cancer in New Zealand. - Encourage research globally into low-grade serous ovarian cancer by directly funding research and encouraging and assisting other charities and/or organisations to fund research for the benefit New Zealander's with this rare ovarian cancer.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Fund-raising

Health

Other (please state)

(People affected by ovarian cancer)

Entity Structure

The Trust operates from Dunedin. The Trust Deed states that there must be between two and five trustees. The Trust currently has two trustees that constitute the governance board.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/11/2022 1/12/2022 $110,313 $70,567
31/10/2021 26/10/2021 $172,423 $85,248
31/10/2020 2/11/2020 $160,759 $106,499
31/10/2019 31/10/2019 $88,493 $3,479

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Benjamin Conway Russell Trustee 27/09/2022
Alana Allan Trustee 20/12/2021
Alicia Didsbury Trustee 20/12/2021
Liz Pennington Trustee 20/12/2021
Jane Mary Ludemann Trustee 31/05/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Elspeth Joan Ludemann Trustee 20/12/2021

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/09/2022 NOC011
30/09/2022 NOC010
11/04/2022 NOC009
26/10/2021 NOC007
6/07/2021 NOC006
8/08/2019 NOC003
19/11/2018 NOC001

Charity Documents