pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Havelock Museum Society Inc
CC10251
9429042718970
Registered

Registration details

7/05/2007
March 31

Address for service

4197 State Highway 6
RD 1
Havelock
7178
74 Main Road
Havelock 7100
Marlborough
7100

Charity's other details

027 262 3491


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Havelock Museum is to shed light upon the history of our community from the early pioneers to the present, to increase understanding and appreciation of our community’s heritage. To preserve and present for the public’s education and enjoyment, the collection acquired of the Havelock area’s history.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

See Statement of Purpose

Arts / culture / heritage

General public

Entity Structure

The Society has a Committee of 8 members consisting of our Chairperson/Treasurer, Vice Chairperson, Secretary and five Committee members. The main sources of our funding are from member subscriptions community grants, donations and proceeds from weekly flea-market. The Association relies fully on its voluntary members and Associate Members to run all our activities.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 7/08/2023 $166,224 $11,067
30/09/2022 1/07/2022 $68,648 $55,966
30/09/2021 16/06/2021 $42,235 $12,548
30/09/2020 21/08/2020 $20,920 $11,955
30/09/2019 18/08/2019 $18,958 $12,389
30/09/2018 6/06/2018 $54,849 $17,409
30/09/2017 3/09/2017 $21,364 $13,325
30/09/2016 4/08/2016 $22,644 $10,709
30/09/2015 6/09/2015 $27,767 $25,085
30/09/2014 18/08/2014 $69,869 $88,335

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Denis Michael Maher Committee Member 23/11/2022
Beverley Ann McClimont Secretary 30/05/2021
Logan Eyre Coote Committee Member 2/08/2019
Marion Marfell Committee Member 28/01/2016
Ian Charles Cameron Vice Chairperson 24/08/2011
Henrica Collet-Jacobson Chairperson/Treasurer 22/03/2007
Joan Huddleston Committee Member 22/03/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Felicity Marshall Committee member 15/11/2023
Linden Armstrong Chairperson 29/06/2022
Merriann Kaye Stewart Committee Member 20/05/2021
Pamela Joyce Mary Mullis Committee Member 9/01/2021
Eve Loraine Barsanti Committee member 5/11/2018
Graeme Spinley Barsanti Committee Member 25/03/2018
Brian John Collins Chairman 11/07/2017
Robert Joseph King-turner Committee Member 23/11/2016
Valerie Francis Committee 28/12/2015
Pamela Beth Burrows Committee 23/07/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
28/10/2023 NOC026
12/07/2022 NOC024
21/03/2022 NOC022
30/05/2021 NOC020
2/05/2018 NOC016
16/02/2018 NOC015
4/02/2017 NOC013
3/03/2016 NOC010
6/09/2015 NOC009
18/08/2014 NOC008

Charity Documents