pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Lopdell Trust
CC22875
9429043221011
Registered

Registration details

11/04/2008
March 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Lopdell House Development Trust 12/04/2008
Lopdell Trust 7/08/2014

Address for service

PO Box 60676
Titirangi
Auckland
0604

Charity's other details

(09)8178087 ext 202


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Lopdell Trust was established with the purpose of promoting and developing education and learning in relation to the performing and fine art disciplines. The Trust has achieved its objectives to date through the management of the redevelopment of the Lopdell Precinct (Lopdell House seismic upgrade and refurbishment, Lopdell Hall refurbishment and provision of associated carpark and the construction of the new Te Uru Waitakere Contemporary Gallery a significant new public gallery for the West Auckland region.These works thus complete the Lopdell Precinct - an integrated facility for the community which proactively allows for the advancement , education and engagement in fine art and performing art.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds)

Arts / culture / heritage

Environment / conservation

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, all peoples

Entity Structure

The Lopdell Trust is a charitable trust which continues to operate under a 20 year licence from Auckland Council as the not for profit governing body responsible for the strategic and community-minded stewardship of the Lopdell Precinct ensuring that the precinct be a sound and fit for purpose community facility for the promotion , advancement and education of the arts.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2020 21/04/2021 $465,109 $392,188
30/09/2019 17/06/2020 $467,179 $248,155
30/09/2018 15/11/2018 $433,762 $592,092
30/09/2017 27/12/2017 $435,904 $546,127
30/09/2016 19/01/2018 $685,982 $503,250
30/09/2015 5/10/2015 $1,772,772 $185,005
30/09/2014 3/10/2014 $9,115,544 $31,462
30/09/2013 30/09/2013 $3,932,615 $31,271
30/09/2012 28/09/2012 $1,466,181 $49,293
30/09/2011 15/08/2011 $191,828 $43,559

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Craig Oliver Bodmin Trustee 1/04/2017
Thomas Michael Carter Trustee 1/04/2017
Jeffery Wells Trustee 25/03/2010
Terence George Bates Trustee 27/03/2007
Timothy Grant Livingstone Trustee 27/03/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Gregory Boone Presland Trustee 31/03/2019
Charlene Scotti Trustee 30/09/2015
Allan Arthur Wild Vice Chair 24/09/2010
Ross Ian Clow Trustee 11/06/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
17/06/2020 NOC014
8/10/2018 NOC012
14/08/2014 NOC007
30/09/2013 AR006
28/09/2012 AR005
14/10/2010 AR003
12/10/2009 AR002

Charity Documents